EP2468040 - HOME BASE STATIONS UNSUCCESSFUL DL PACKETS AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANAPATHY, Suresh c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2012/26] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10747698.8 | 10.08.2010 | [2018/10] | WO2010JP63795 | Priority number, date | GB20090014427 | 18.08.2009 Original published format: GB 0914427 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011021596 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2468040 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2468040 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
H04W36/0058 (EP,GB,US);
H04W88/16 (GB,KR,US);
H04W8/00 (GB);
H04W36/02 (KR);
H04W36/08 (EP,GB,KR,US);
H04W88/08 (KR,US);
H04W84/045 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERFOLGLOSE DL-PAKETBÜNDELUNG BEI HEIMBASISSTATIONEN | [2012/26] | English: | HOME BASE STATIONS UNSUCCESSFUL DL PACKETS AGGREGATION | [2012/26] | French: | AGRÉGATION DE PAQUETS DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE SANS SUCCÈS DE STATIONS DE BASE DE RATTACHEMENT | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 18.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18153497.5 / EP3334213 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2010 | AL | 07.03.2018 | AT | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | CZ | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | PL | 07.03.2018 | RO | 07.03.2018 | SE | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | PT | 09.07.2018 | IE | 10.08.2018 | LU | 10.08.2018 | MT | 10.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 10.08.2010 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MK | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
MT | 10.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 10.08.2010 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
MT | 10.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
MT | 10.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1341342 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [I]WO2008123140 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | EP2139258 [ ] (NEC CORP [JP]); | by applicant | EP1341342 | WO2008123140 |