EP2477993 - SUBSTITUTED CLAVULANIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nabriva Therapeutics AG Leberstrasse 20 1112 Wien / AT | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULUSU, Atchyuta, Rama, Chandra, Murty Hochbergstrasse 38 A-2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Albin Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2012/30] | Application number, filing date | 10747788.7 | 12.08.2010 | WO2010AT00297 | Priority number, date | AT20090001458 | 15.09.2009 Original published format: AT 14582009 | [2012/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011032192 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2477993 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2477993 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/04, A61K31/424, A61P31/04 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE CLAVULANSÄURE | [2012/30] | English: | SUBSTITUTED CLAVULANIC ACID | [2012/30] | French: | ACIDE CLAVULANIQUE SUBSTITUÉ | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 26.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2010 | AL | 24.06.2015 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | DK | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | ES | 24.06.2015 | FI | 24.06.2015 | HR | 24.06.2015 | IT | 24.06.2015 | LT | 24.06.2015 | LV | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | MK | 24.06.2015 | MT | 24.06.2015 | NL | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | SE | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | SM | 24.06.2015 | TR | 24.06.2015 | AT | 12.08.2015 | IE | 12.08.2015 | LU | 12.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | NO | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | IS | 24.10.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
TR | 24.06.2015 | ||
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
TR | 24.06.2015 | ||
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XAI] - READING C ET AL, "STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS AMONGST BETA-LACTAMASE INHIBITORS", JOURNAL OF ENZYME INHIBITION, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19860101), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 83 - 104, XP000985066 [X] 9,15 * BRL 21478 Table VIII: no activity * [A] 1-8,12-14 [I] 9-11,15,16 |