EP2474028 - DEVICE FOR HOUSING A SUBSTRATE, AND RELATIVE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACCINI, Andrea Via Duca D'Aosta 60 I-31030 Mignagola di Carbonera / IT | 02 /
CELLERE, Giorgio Via XXV Aprile 7 I-36040 Torri Di Quartesolo / IT | 03 /
DE SANTI, Luigi Via G. Leopardi 4/A I-31027 Spresiano / IT | 04 /
GALIAZZO, Marco Vicolo D. Flabanico 6 I-35127 Padova / IT | 05 /
PASQUALIN, Gianfranco Via Gasparotto Vecellio 19 I-31027 Spresiano / IT | 06 /
VERCESI, Tommaso Viale Lombardia 13/2 I-31057 Silea / IT | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 10747869.5 | 02.09.2010 | WO2010EP62856 | Priority number, date | IT2009UD00151 | 03.09.2009 Original published format: IT UD20090151 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011026888 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474028 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/68 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
H01L21/67346 (EP,US);
H01L21/67736 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME EINES SUBSTRATS UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2012/28] | English: | DEVICE FOR HOUSING A SUBSTRATE, AND RELATIVE METHOD | [2012/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LOGER UN SUBSTRAT, ET PROCÉDÉ AFFÉRENT | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 15.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE4419134 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 48 * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 68 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *[I] 5-10 |