EP2467433 - FLUORESCENT PERYLENE DERIVATIVES FOR DIRECT DETECTION OF HEPARIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krämer, Roland Ortenauer Str. 5a 69126 Heidelberg / DE | For all designated states Harenberg, Job Panoramastr. 116 69126 Heidelberg / DE | For all designated states Szelke, Helga Zelglistr. 7 5000 Aarau / CH | For all designated states Poeck, Armin Wundstr. 9//11 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [2012/34] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Krämer, Roland Ortenauer Str. 5a 69126 Heidelberg / DE | ||
For all designated states Harenberg, Job Panoramastr. 116 69126 Heidelberg / DE | |||
For all designated states Szelke, Helga Zelglistr. 7 5000 Aarau / CH | |||
For all designated states Poeck, Armin Wundtstr. 9 69123 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/39] |
Former [2012/28] | 01 /
KRAEMER, Roland Zumbuschstrasse 2 48167 Münster / DE | ||
02 /
SZELKE, Helga Neckarhangweg 1 69118 Heidelberg / DE | |||
03 /
HARENBERG, Job Panoramastrasse 116 69126 Heidelberg / DE | |||
04 /
POECK, Armin Wundstrasse 9// 11 69123 Heidelberg / DE | |||
Former [2012/26] | 01 /
KRAEMER, Roland Zumbuschstrasse 2 48167 Münster / DE | ||
02 /
SZELKE, Helga Neckarhangweg 1 69118 Heidelberg / DE | |||
03 /
HARENBERG, Job Panoramastrasse 116 69126 Heidelberg / DE | |||
04 /
POECK, Armin Wundstrasse 9/11 69123 Heidelberg / DE | Representative(s) | Elbel, Michaela PATERIS Patentanwälte PartmbB Postfach 33 07 11 80067 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Elbel, Michaela Pateris Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Altheimer Eck 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10748072.5 | 19.08.2010 | WO2010EP62118 | Priority number, date | EP20090168292 | 20.08.2009 Original published format: EP 09168292 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011020887 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467433 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467433 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09B5/62 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
C09B5/62 (EP,US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORESZIERENDE PERYLENDERIVATE ZUR DIREKTEN DETEKTION VON HEPARIN | [2014/39] | English: | FLUORESCENT PERYLENE DERIVATIVES FOR DIRECT DETECTION OF HEPARIN | [2012/26] | French: | DERIVES DE PERYLENE FLUORESCENTS POUR LA DETECTION DIRECTE D'HEPARINE | [2014/39] |
Former [2012/26] | FLUORESZIERENDE PERYLENDERIVATE FÜR DEN DIREKTEN NACHWEIS VON HEPARIN | ||
Former [2012/26] | DÉRIVÉS DE PÉRYLÈNE FLUORESCENTS POUR LA DÉTECTION DIRECTE DE L'HÉPARINE | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 26.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2010 | AL | 08.10.2014 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BE | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | IT | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MK | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SE | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | SM | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MK | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007004919 (KOHL CHRISTOPHER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1 - paragraph 0002 * * page 1 - paragraph 0009 * * page 3; example 4 * * page 3, paragraph 0019 *; | [A]US5811307 (RILL RANDOLPH L [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * columns 3-4 * * column 5 - column 9; examples 1-7 *; | [A]US2002012947 (BEVERS SUSAN ANN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [YD] - FRANCESCHIN, BIOORG.MED.CHEM, (20071231), vol. 16, pages 2292 - 2304, XP002573600 [YD] 1-15 * page 2293; figure 1 * * page 2293 - column left, paragraph 2 * * page 2393 - column right, paragraph 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2007.11.065 | [Y] - MECCA, ORG.BIOMOL.CHEM., (20060830), vol. 4, pages 3763 - 3768, XP002573601 [Y] 1-15 * page 3764 - column left * * page 3763 - column right, paragraph last * * page 3764; figure 2 * * page 3764 - column left, paragraph 3 * * page 3764 - column left, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b608887b | [A] - SAUCEDA, CHEMBIOCHEM, (20070123), vol. 8, pages 391 - 394, XP002573608 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200600361 | by applicant | - DESPOTIS, G.J.; GRAVLEE, G.; FILOS, K.; LEVY, J., ANESTHESIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 91, page 1122 | - FRANCESCHIN; M.; LOMBARDO; C.M.; PASCUCCI; E.; D'AMBROSIO; D.; MICHELI; E.; BIANCO,A; ORTAGGI, M; SAVINO, M, BIOORG. MED. CHEM, (2008), vol. 16, page 2292 | - WANG, S.; CHANG, Y.-T., COMMUN., (2008), vol. 10, page 1173 | - WRIGHT, A.T.; ZHONG, Z.L.; ANSLYN E.V., ANGEW.CHEM.INT.ED., (2005), vol. 44, page 5679 |