EP2404900 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AMIDE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1978-96, Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUGIMOTO, Junichi c/o UBE INDUSTRIES LTD. 1978-96 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | 02 /
SUGIMOTO, Tsunemi c/o UBE INDUSTRIES LTD. 1978-96 Oaza Kogushi Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10748822.3 | 04.03.2010 | WO2010JP53584 | Priority number, date | JP20090049998 | 04.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009049998 | JP20090097168 | 13.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009097168 | JP20090248354 | 29.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009248354 | [2012/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010101229 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2404900 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2404900 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D201/04, C07D225/02, C07B61/00 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
C07D225/02 (EP,US);
C07D201/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AMIDVERBINDUNG | [2012/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AMIDE COMPOUND | [2012/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSÉ AMIDE | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2011 | Translation filed | 30.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 10.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2010 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BE | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | HR | 24.09.2014 | IT | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | MK | 24.09.2014 | MT | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | SM | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | NO | 24.12.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | GB | 04.03.2015 | IE | 04.03.2015 | LU | 04.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 04.03.2010 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BE | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
GB | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 04.03.2010 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
GB | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
GB | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
GB | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
GB | 04.03.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2534538 (ATO CHIMIE) [XD] 1-10 * page 1, first paragraph;;; example -; claim - * | International search | [X]JP2008156277 (DAICEL CHEM); | [X]WO2007125002 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al); | [X]JPS5141376 (AQUITAINE TOTAL ORGANICO); | [XP]JP2009185005 (UNIV NAGOYA, et al); | [XP]JP2009298706 (DAICEL CHEM) | by applicant | JPS5233118B | JPH054964 | JP2001302602 | JP2001302603 | JP2001072658 | JPH09301951 | JPH09301952 | JP2001019670 | JPS4623740B | JPS4718114 | JP2006219470 | WO2007125002 | JP2008156277 | JP2008162935 | JPS5141376 | JPS5212198B | JPS62215558 | JP2004059553 | JP2009298706 | JP2009185005 | - K. NARASAKA, CHEMISTRY LETTER, (1993), pages 489 - 492 | - J. S. SANDHU, INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (2002), pages 154 - 156 | - J. S. YADAV, JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH(S, (2002), pages 236 - 238 | - K. ISHIHARA, JOURNAL OF AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2005), pages 11240 - 11241 | - M. ZHU, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2006), pages 4861 - 4863 | - MARIN G. HITZLER, LIEBIGS ANN, (1996), pages 247 - 257 |