EP2404187 - DETECTION OF SURFACE AND BURIED OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L-3 Communications Cyterra Corporation 7558 Southland Boulevard, Suite 130 Orlando, FL 32809 / US | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUVOISSIN III, Herbert 3408 Herringridge Ct. Orlando, FL 32812 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Kevin L. 2014 Applegate Drive Ocoee, FL 34761 / US | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10749045.0 | 03.03.2010 | WO2010US00641 | Priority number, date | US20090157098P | 03.03.2009 Original published format: US 157098 P | US20090243814P | 18.09.2009 Original published format: US 243814 P | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010101630 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2404187 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/02 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
G01V11/00 (EP,KR,US);
G01D1/00 (EP,US);
G01D15/00 (EP,US);
G01D21/00 (EP,US);
G01S3/02 (KR);
G01V3/08 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERKENNUNG VON OBJEKTEN AUF UND UNTER DER OBERFLÄCHE | [2012/02] | English: | DETECTION OF SURFACE AND BURIED OBJECTS | [2012/02] | French: | DÉTECTION D'OBJETS DE SURFACE ET ENTERRÉS | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 24.04.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5680048 (WOLLNY WALTER THOMAS [US]); | [X]US6377872 (STRUCKMAN KEITH A [US]) |