EP2611321 - VENTILATING SOLE ELEMENT FOR A SHOE AS WELL AS SOLE ASSEMBLY AND WATERPROOF, BREATHABLE SHOE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. L. Gore & Associates GmbH Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22 85640 Putzbrunn / DE | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates Scandinavia AB Box 268 431 23 Mölndal / SE | For all designated states Ecco Sko A/S Industrivej 5 6261 Bredebro / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates GmbH Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22 85640 Putzbrunn / DE | ||
For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates Scandinavia AB Box 268 431 23 Mölndal / SE | |||
For all designated states Ecco Sko A/S Industrivej 5 6261 Bredebro / DK | |||
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates GmbH Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22 85640 Putzbrunn / DE | ||
For all designated states W.l. Gore & Associates Scandinavia AB Box 268 431 23 Mölndal / SE | |||
For all designated states Ecco Sko A/S Industrivej 5 6261 Bredebro / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIER, Christian Harzberg 16 83714 Miesbach / DE | 02 /
NABERNIK, Stane Kurirska pot 23 4000 Kranj / SI | 03 /
HÜBNER, Thorger Breitenbergweg 4 83126 Flintsbach / DE | 04 /
STRÖMFORS, Tore Bräckavägen 44 S-437 42 Lindome / SE | 05 /
JENSEN, Frank Sct. Hansvej 24 DK-6261 Bredebro / DK | 06 /
MØLLER HANSEN, Jakob Gamle Kongevej 41 DK-6200 Aabenraa / DK | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2015/32] |
Former [2013/28] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10749477.5 | 03.09.2010 | WO2010EP62983 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012028209 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611321 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611321 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/06, A43B7/08, A43B7/12, A43B13/12 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
A43B7/087 (EP,US);
A43B7/06 (US);
A43B13/12 (EP,US);
A43B7/088 (EP,US);
A43B7/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | A43B7/12, A43B13/12, A43B7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÜFTUNGSSOHLENELEMENT FÜR EINEN SCHUH, SOWIE SOHLENAUFBAU UND WASSERDICHTER UND ATMUNGSAKTIVER SCHUH MIT DIESEM ELEMENT. | [2014/35] | English: | VENTILATING SOLE ELEMENT FOR A SHOE AS WELL AS SOLE ASSEMBLY AND WATERPROOF, BREATHABLE SHOE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2013/28] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE SEMELLE VENTILÉ POUR UNE CHAUSSURE, ET SEMELAGE ET CHAUSSURE ÉTANCHE ET RESPIRANTE MUNIS DE CETTE ÉLÉMENT | [2014/35] |
Former [2013/28] | ENTLÜFTENDES SOHLENELEMENT FÜR EINEN SCHUH SOWIE SOHLENANORDNUNG UND WASSERFESTER, ATMUNGSAKTIVER SCHUH DAMIT | ||
Former [2013/28] | ELÉMENT SEMELLE DE VENTILATION POUR CHAUSSURE, ENSEMBLE SEMELLE ET CHAUSSURE IMPERMÉABLE À L'EAU ET PERMÉABLE À L'AIR COMPRENANT LEDIT ENSEMBLE | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 21.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2010 | AL | 05.08.2015 | BE | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | HR | 05.08.2015 | LT | 05.08.2015 | LV | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | MK | 05.08.2015 | MT | 05.08.2015 | NL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | SM | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | IE | 03.09.2015 | LU | 03.09.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | IS | 05.12.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 03.09.2010 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MK | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.09.2015 | ||
LU | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 03.09.2010 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.09.2015 | ||
LU | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 03.09.2010 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | BE | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 05.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR718476 (MEUCCI ENRICO) [X] 1-5,16,17,21-29,32,34,35,37 * page 2; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2239211 (KALB WYLIE WILLIAM DE) [X] 1-8,10,13,16,17,19,21,24-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB999207 (VER NL RUBBERFABRIEKEN NV) [Y] 12 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0135368 (MULTIPLE RESOURCES VENDOR INC [US]) [X] 1-8,10,13,16,17,19-26,37 * page 4 - page 8; figure - *; | [X]US4939851 (MILLER HARRY [US]) [X] 1-5,10,13,16,19,21,24-26,37* the whole document *; | [X]US5400526 (SESSA RAYMOND V [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,13-15,21,24-28,34,35 * column 3 - column 6; figure - *; | [XY]EP1358811 (SIXTY ACTIVE S P A [IT]) [X] 1-9,11,14,16-26,28,29,32,34,35,37 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0058]; figure - * [Y] 12; | [X]US2007028483 (MIYATA YOSHIAKI [JP]) [X] 1-7,10,11,17,19,21,24-26,37 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0037]; figure - *; | [E]EP2294936 (WOLVERINE WORLD WIDE INC [US]) [E] 1-40 * figures 2-5, 10-14 * | by applicant | US3953566 | US4187390 | US4194041 | US4493870 | US4725418 | US5329807 | EP1033924 |