EP2407532 - Isolation, identification and characterisation of strains with probiotic activity, from faeces of infants fed exclusively with breast milk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/03] | ISOLATION, IDENTIFICATION AND CHARACTERISATION OF STRAINS WITH PROBIOTIC ACTIVITY, FROM FAECES OF INFANTS FED EXCLUSIVELY WITH BREAST MILK | ||
[2014/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hero AG Karl Roth-Strasse 8 5600 Lenzburg / CH | [2013/52] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Hero España, S.A. GTC Infant Nutrition, Av Murcia 1 30820 Alcantarilla, Murcia / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIEITES FERNÁNDEZ, José María Departamento de Bioquímica y Biología Molecular Il Instituto de Nutrición y Tecnología de los Alimentos Universidad de Granada-Campus de Ia Salud E-18071 Granada / ES | 02 /
MUÑOZ QUEZADA, Sergio Departamento de Bioquímica y Biología Molecular Il Instituto de Nutrición y Tecnología de los Alimentos Universidad de Granada-Campus de Ia Salud E-18071 Granada / ES | 03 /
LLAMAS COMPANY, Inmaculada Departamento de Microbiología Facultad de Farmacia Universidad de Granada Campus de Ia Salud E-18071 Granada / ES | 04 /
MALDONADO LOZANO, José Departamento de Pediatría Facultad de Medicina Avda. de Madrid n° 11 - Universidad de Granada E-18012 Granada / ES | 05 /
ROMERO BRAQUEHAIS, Fernando Hero España S.A. Instituto Hero de Nutrición Infantil Avda. Murcia 1 E-30820 Alcantarilla (Murcia) / ES | 06 /
SUÁREZ GARCÍA, Antonio Francisco Departamento de Bioquímica y Biología Molecular Il Instituto de Nutrición y Tecnología de los Alimentos Universidad de Granada-Campus de Ia Salud E-18071 Granada / ES | 07 /
GIL HERNÁNDEZ, Ángel Departamento de Bioquímica y Biología Molecular Il Instituto de Nutrición y Tecnología de los Alimentos Universidad de Granada-Campus de Ia Salud E-18071 Granada / ES | 08 /
GÓMEZ LLORENTE, Carolina GTC Infant Nutrition Avda. Murcia 1 30820 Alcantarilla / ES | 09 /
BERMÚDEZ BRITO, Miriam GTC Infant Nutrition Avda. Murcia 1 30820 Alcantarilla / ES | [2012/03] |
Former [N/P] | 01 /
VIEITES FERNÁNDEZ, José María Departamento de Bioquímica y Biología Molecular Il Instituto de Nutrición y Tecnología de los Alimentos Universidad de Granada-Campus de Ia Salud E-18071 Granada / ES | ||
02 /
MUÑOZ QUEZADA, Sergio Departamento de Bioquímica y Biología Molecular Il Instituto de Nutrición y Tecnología de los Alimentos Universidad de Granada-Campus de Ia Salud E-18071 Granada / ES | |||
03 /
LLAMAS COMPANY, Inmaculada Departamento de Microbiología Facultad de Farmacia Universidad de Granada Campus de Ia Salud E-18071 Granada / ES | |||
04 /
MALDONADO LOZANO, José Departamento de Pediatría Facultad de Medicina Avda. de Madrid n° 11 - Universidad de Granada E-18012 Granada / ES | |||
05 /
ROMERO BRAQUEHAIS, Fernando Hero España S.A. Instituto Hero de Nutrición Infantil Avda. Murcia 1 E-30820 Alcantarilla (Murcia) / ES | |||
06 /
SUÁREZ GARCÍA, Antonio Francisco Departamento de Bioquímica y Biología Molecular Il Instituto de Nutrición y Tecnología de los Alimentos Universidad de Granada-Campus de Ia Salud E-18071 Granada / ES | |||
07 /
GIL HERNÁNDEZ, Ángel Departamento de Bioquímica y Biología Molecular Il Instituto de Nutrición y Tecnología de los Alimentos Universidad de Granada-Campus de Ia Salud E-18071 Granada / ES | Representative(s) | Gonzalez-Alberto Rodriguez, Natalia GARRIGUES IP, S.L.P. Hermosilla, 3 28001 Madrid / ES | [2012/03] | Application number, filing date | 10750390.6 | 09.03.2010 | WO2010ES00097 | Priority number, date | WO2009ES00130 | 10.03.2009 Original published format: PCT/ES2009/000130 | [2012/03] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010103140 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | ES | [2010/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2407532 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2407532 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 04.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, A23C9/12, A23L1/29, C12R1/225, A23L1/30, C12R1/01, A61K35/74 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
A61K35/747 (US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K35/745 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2400/175 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/3204 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/14] | C12N1/20, A23C9/12, A23L1/29, C12R1/225, A23L1/30, C12R1/01 | ||
Former IPC [2012/03] | C12N1/20, A23C9/12, A61K35/66, C12R1/225 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Isolierung, Identifizierung und Charakterisierung von Stämmen mit probiotischer Aktivität aus Stuhlproben von ausschliesslich mit Muttermilch gefütterten Säuglingen | [2014/28] | English: | Isolation, identification and characterisation of strains with probiotic activity, from faeces of infants fed exclusively with breast milk | [2014/28] | French: | Isolement, identification et caractérisation de souches à activité probiotique à partir des selles de nourrissons alimentés exclusivement de lait maternel | [2014/28] |
Former [2012/03] | ISOLIERUNG, IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON STÄMMEN MIT PROBIOTISCHER AKTIVITÄT AUS STUHLPROBEN VON AUSSCHLIESSLICH MIT MUTTERMILCH GEFÜTTERTEN SÄUGLINGEN | ||
Former [2012/03] | ISOLATION, IDENTIFICATION AND CHARACTERISATION OF STRAINS WITH PROBIOTIC ACTIVITY, FROM FAECES OF INFANTS FED EXCLUSIVELY WITH BREAST MILK | ||
Former [2012/03] | ISOLEMENT, IDENTIFICATION ET CARACTÉRISATION DE SOUCHES À ACTIVITÉ PROBIOTIQUE À PARTIR DES SELLES DE NOURRISSONS ALIMENTÉS EXCLUSIVEMENT DE LAIT MATERNEL | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2011 | Translation filed | 07.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 01.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14190638.8 / EP2848681 | EP14190648.7 / EP2848682 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2010 | AT | 10.12.2014 | BG | 10.12.2014 | CY | 10.12.2014 | CZ | 10.12.2014 | EE | 10.12.2014 | GR | 10.12.2014 | HR | 10.12.2014 | LT | 10.12.2014 | LV | 10.12.2014 | MC | 10.12.2014 | MK | 10.12.2014 | MT | 10.12.2014 | RO | 10.12.2014 | SI | 10.12.2014 | SK | 10.12.2014 | SM | 10.12.2014 | TR | 10.12.2014 | IE | 09.03.2015 | LU | 09.03.2015 | NO | 10.03.2015 | IS | 10.04.2015 | PT | 10.04.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 09.03.2010 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
TR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.03.2015 | ||
LU | 09.03.2015 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.03.2015 | ||
LU | 09.03.2015 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.03.2015 | ||
LU | 09.03.2015 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.03.2015 | ||
LU | 09.03.2015 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.03.2015 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 10.12.2014 | |
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 10.12.2014 | |
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 10.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - KHALIL R ET AL, "Evaluation of the probiotic potential of lactic acid bacteria isolated from faeces of breast-fed infants in Egypt", AFRICAN JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY 20070402 KE, (20070402), vol. 6, no. 7, ISSN 1684-5315, pages 935 - 945, XP002692913 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - MISRA A K ET AL, "CULTURAL AND BIOCHEMICAL ACTIVITIES OF BIFIDOBACTERIUM BIFIDUM", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT, VV GMBH VOLKSWIRTSCHAFTLICHER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19900101), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0026-3788, pages 155 - 158, XP000126362 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - WASILEWSKA EWA ET AL, "ISOLATION AND IDENTIFICATION OF BIFIDOBACTERIA FROM INFANT GUT", POLISH JOURNAL OF FOOD AND NUTRITION SCIENCES, POLSKA AKADEMIA NAUK, OLSZTYN-KORTOWO, PL, (20030101), vol. 12/53, no. SI 1, ISSN 1230-0322, pages 90 - 94, XP009082841 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - KOTSOU MARIA G ET AL, "In vitro assessment of probiotic properties of Lactobacillus strains from infant gut microflora", FOOD BIOTECHNOLOGY, DEKKER, NEW YORK, NY, USA, vol. 22, no. 1-2, doi:10.1080/08905430701707844, ISSN 0890-5436, (20080101), pages 1 - 17, (20080214), XP008142919 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/08905430701707844 | [A] - AHRNE S ET AL, "Lactobacilli in the intestinal microbiota of Swedish infants", MICROBES AND INFECTION, ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, vol. 7, no. 11-12, ISSN 1286-4579, (20050801), pages 1256 - 1262, (20050801), XP027845995 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO0067583 (GERVAIS DANONE SA [FR], et al); | [A]EP1415656 (NESTLE SA [CH]); | [A]WO2006108824 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al); | [A]WO2007125558 (ANIDRAL SRL [IT], et al); | [A]US2008187525 (PORUBCAN RANDOLPH S [US]); | [A]EP1974743 (NESTEC SA [CH]); | [A] - MARTIN F-P J. ET AL., "Top-down systems biology integration of conditional prebiotic modulated transgenomic interactions in a humanized microbiome mouse model.", MOLECULAR SYSTEMS BIOLOGY., (20080715), vol. 4, no. 205, XP002680209 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/MSB.2008.40 | [A] - TIMMERMAN H. M. ET AL., "Design of a multispecies probiotic mixture to prevent infectious complications in critically ill patients.", CLINICAL NUTRITION., (2007), vol. 26, pages 450 - 459, XP022159289 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clnu.2007.04.008 | [A] - SAAVEDRA J. M. ET AL., "Use of probiotics in pediatrics: rationale, mechanisms of action and practical aspects.", NUTRITION IN CLINICAL PRACTICE., (200706), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 351 - 365, XP009129949 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0115426507022003351 | by applicant | - ADOLFSSON O, MEYDANI SN, RUSSELL RM., "Yogurt and gut function", AM J CLIN NUTR, (2004), vol. 80, pages 245 - 256 | - AGARWAL BB, SHISHODIA S, ASHIKAWA K, BHARTI AC., "The role of TNF and its family members in inflammation and cancer: lessons from gene deletion", CURR DRUG TARGETS INFLAMM ALLERGY, vol. 1, pages 327 - 41 | - AKALIN AS, GONC S, DUZEL S, "Influence of yogurt and acidophilus yogurt on serum cholesterol leveis in micej", DAIRY SCI, (1997), vol. 80, pages 2721 - 25 | - ANDRIGHETTO C, DE DEA P, LOMBARDI A, NEVIANI E, ROSSETTI L., GIRAFFA G., "Molecular identification and cluster analysis of homofermentative thermophiliclactobacilli isolated from dairy products", RES MICROBIOL, (1998), vol. 149, pages 631 - 643 | - ARCHER SY, MENG S, SHEI A ET AL., "P21 (WAFI) is required for butyrate-mediated growth inhibition of human colon cancer cells", PROC NATI ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 6791 - 96 | - ARHNE S, MOLIN G, STAHL S., "Plasmids in Lactobacillus strain isolated from meat and meat products", SYST APPL MICROBIOL, (1989), vol. 11, pages 320 - 325 | - BACKHED F, LEY RE, SONNENBURG JL ET AL., "Host-bacterial mutualism in the human intestine", SCIENCE., (2005), vol. 307, pages 1915 - 1920 | - BAI AP, OUYANG Q, XIAO X, LI SF., "Probiotics modulate inflammatory cytokine secretion from inflammed mucosa in active ulcerative colitis", INT J CLIN PRACT, (2006), vol. 60, pages 284 - 88 | - BARRY T, COLLERAN G, GLENON M, DUNICAN L, GANNON F., "The 16S/23S ribosomal spacer as a target for DNA probes to identify eubacteria", PCR METHODS APPL, (1991), vol. 1, pages 51 - 56 | - BEERENS., "Deteccion of bifidobacteria by using propionic acid as a selective agent", APPL ENV MICROBIO, (1991), vol. 57, pages 2418 - 19 | - BERG RD., "conbiotics", TRENDS MICROBIOL, (1998), vol. 6, pages 89 - 92 | - BERNET MF, BRASSART D, NEESER JR, SERVIN AL., "Lactobacillus acidophilus LA-1 binds to cultured human intestinal cell-lines and inhibits cell attachment and cell invasion by enterovirulent bacteria", GUT, (1994), vol. 35, pages 483 - 9 | - BEZIRTZOGLOU E., "The intestinal microflora during the first weeks of life", ANAEROBE, (1997), vol. 3, pages 173 - 177 | - BILLER JA, KATZ AJ, FLORES AF, BUIE TM, GORBACH SL., "Treatment of recurrent Clostridium difficile colitis with Lactobacillus GG", J PEDIATR GASTROENTEROL NUTR., (1995), vol. 21, pages 224 - 6 | - BLACK FT, ANDERSEN PL, ORSKOV J ET AL., "Prophylactic efficacy of lactobacilli. on travelers diarrhea", TRAVEL MED, (1989), vol. 7, pages 333 - 5 | - BOTESM, LOOS B, VAN REENEN CA, "Adhesion fo the probiotics strains Enterococcus mundtii ST4SA and Lactobacillus plantarum 423 to Caco-2 cells under conditions simulating the intestinal tract, and in the presence of antibiotics and anti- inflammatory medicaments", ARCH MICROBIOL, (2008), vol. 190, pages 573 - 584 | - BOTIC, T., KLINGBERG, T.D., WEINGARTL, H., CENCIC, A., "A novel eukaryotic cell culture model to study antiviral activity of potential probiotic bacteria", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD MICROBIOLOGY., (2007), vol. 115, no. 2, pages 227 - 234 | - BOUTON Y, GUYOT P, GRAPPIN R., "Preliminary characterization of microflora of comte cheese", J APPL MICROBIOL, (1998), vol. 85, pages 123 - 131 | - BROWNLEE IA, HAVLER ME, DETTMAR PW, ALIEN A, PEARSON JP, "Colonic mucus: secretion and turnover in relation to dietary fibre intake", PROC NUTR SOC, (2003), vol. 62, pages 245 - 249 | - BUTLER M, NG C, VAN HEEL D, LOMBARDA G, LECHLER R, PLAYFORD R, GHOSH S., "Modulation of dendritic cell phenotype and function in an in vitro model of the intestinal epithelium", EUR J IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 36, pages 864 - 74 | - BUTS JP, DE KEYSER N., "Effects of Saccharomyces boulardü on intestinal mucosa", DIG DIS SCI, (2006), vol. 51, pages 1485 - 92 | - BUTS JP, DEKEYSER N, MARANDI S, HERMANS D, CHAE YHE, LAMBOTTE L, CHANTEUX H, TULKENS PM., "Saccharomyces boulardii up-grades cellular adaptation after proximal enterectomy in rats.", GUT, (1999), vol. 45, pages 89 - 96 | - CASTAGLIUOLO I, RIEGLER MF, VALENICK L, LAMONT JT, POTHOULAKIS C., "Sacharomyces boulardii protease inhibits the effects of Clostridium difficile toxins A and B in human colonic mucosa", INFECT IMMU, (1999), vol. 67, pages 302 - 7 | - CEBECI A, GURAKAN C., "Properties of potential probiotic Lactobacillus plantarum strains", FOOD MICROBIOL, (2003), vol. 20, pages 511 - 518 | - CETINA-SAURI G, SIERRA BASTO G., "Evaluation therapeutique de Saccharomyces boulardii chez des enfants souffrant de diarrhee aigue", ANN PEDIATR, (1994), vol. 41, pages 397 - 400 | - CHAI F, EVDOKIOU A, YOUNG GP ET AL., "Involvement of p21 (Waf1/Cip1) and its cleavage by DEVD-caspase during apoptosis of colorectal cancer ccells induced by butyrate", CARCINOGENESIS, (2000), vol. 21, pages 7 - 14 | - CHU H, KANG S, HA S., CHO K, PARK SM, HAN KH ET AL., "Lactobacillus acidophilus expressing recombinant K99 adhesive fimbriae has an inhibitory effect on adhesion of enterotoxigenic escherichia coli", MICROBIOLLMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 49, pages 941 - 8 | - CLEMENTS ML, LEVINE MM, BLACK RE, ROBINS-BROWNE RM, CISNEROS LA, DRUSANO GL, LANATA CF, SAAH AJ., "Lactobacillus prophylaxis for diarrhea due to enterotoxigenic Escherichia coli", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1981), vol. 20, pages 104 - 8 | - COCONNIER M, LIEVIN V, BERNET-CAMARD MF, HUDAULT S, SERVIN A., "ntibacterial effect of the adhering human Lactobacillus acidophilus strain LB", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (1997), vol. 41, pages 1046 - 52 | - COLLINS M, SAMELIS J, METAXOPOULOS J, WALLBANKS S., "Taxonomic studies on some leuconostoc-like organims from fermented sausages: description of a new genus Weissella for the Leuconostoc paramesenteroides group of species", J APPL BACTERIOL, (1993), vol. 75, pages 595 - 603 | - CORONEN R, KORPELA R, MOILANEN E., "Signalling mechanisms involved in the induction of inducible nitric oxide synthase by Lactobacillus rhamnosus GG, endotoxin, and lipoteichoic acid", INFLAMMATION, (2002), vol. 26, pages 207 - 14 | - CUI H, CHEN CL, WANG JD, YANG UJ, CUN Y, WU JB, LIU YH, DAN HL, JIAN YT, CHEN XQ., "Effects of probiotic on intestinal mucosa of patients with ulcerative colitis", WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (2004), vol. 10, pages 1521 - 25 | - DSOUZA AL, RAJKUMAR C, COOKE J, BULPITT CJ., "Probiotics in prevention of antibiotic associated diarrhoea: meta-analysis", BMJ, (2002), vol. 324, page 1361 | - DANIELSON AD, PEO ER JR, SHAHANI KM, LEWIS AJ, WHALEN PJ, AMER MA., "Anticholesteremic property of Lactobacillus acidophilus yogurt fed to mature boars", J ANIM SCL, (1989), vol. 67, pages 966 - 74 | - DE ANGELIS M, CORSETTI A, TOSTI N, ROSSI J, CORBO M, GOBBETTI M., "Characterization of non-starter lactic acid bacteria from Italian ewe cheese based on phenotypic, genotypic, and cell wall protein analyses", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 67, pages 2010 - 20 | - DE MAN JC, ROGOSA M, SHARPE MT., "A medium for the cultivation of lactobacilli", J APPL BACTERIOL, (1960), vol. 23, pages 130 - 5 | - DE VRESE M, STEGELMANN A, RICHTER B, FENSELAU S, LAUE C, SCHREZENMEIR J., "Probiotics-compensation for lactase insufficiency", AM J CLIN NUTR., (2001), vol. 73, no. 421, page 429S | - DESJARDINS ML, ROY D., "Growth of bifidobacteria and their enzyme profiles", J DAIRY SCI, (1990), vol. 73, pages 299 - 307 | - DI CARO S, TAO H, GRILLO A, EHA C, GASBARRINI G, SEPULVEDA AR, GASBARRINI A., "Effects of Lactobacillus GG on genes expression pattern in small bowel mucosa", DIG LIVER DIS, (2005), vol. 37, pages 320 - 29 | - DI SABATINO A, CICCOCIOPPO R, LUINETTI O ET AL., "Increased enterocyte apoptosis in inflamed areas of Crohn's disease", DIS COLON RECTUM, (2003), vol. 46, pages 1498 - 1507 | - DUNNE C, MURPHY L, FLYNN S, O'MAHONY L, O'HALLORAN S, FEENEY M, MORRISSEY D, THORNTON G, FITZGERALD G, DALY C, "Probiotics: from myth to reality. Demonstration of functionality in animal models of disease and in human clinical trials", ANTONIE VAN LEEUWENHOEK., (1999), vol. 76, pages 279 - 92 | - DUNNE C, O'MAHONY L, MURPHY L, THORNTON G, MORRISSEY D, O'HALLORAN S, FEENEY M, FLYNN S, FITZGERALD G, DALY C, "In vitro selection criteria for probiotico bacteria of human origin: correlation with in vivo findings", AM J DIN NUTR, (2001), vol. 73, pages 386S - 92S | - EADEN JA, ABRAMS KR, MATBERRY JF., "The risk of colorectal cancer in ulcerative colitis: a meta-analysis", GUT, (2001), vol. 48, pages 526 - 535 | - FABIA R, ARRAJAB A, JOHANSSON M, ANDERSSON R, WILLEN R, JEPPSSON B, MOLIN G, BENGMARK S., "Impairment of bacterial flora in human ulcerative colitis and experimental colitis in the rat", DIGESTION, (1993), vol. 54, pages 248 - 255 | - FAVIER C, NEUT C, MIZON C, CORTOT A, COLOMBEL J, MIZON J., "Fecal beta-D-galactosidase production and Bifidobacteria are decreased in Crohn's disease", DIG DIS SCI, (1997), vol. 42, pages 817 - 822 | - FLOCH MH, BINDER HJ, FILBURN B, GERSHENGOREN W., "The effect of bile acids on intestinal micromicrobiota", AM J CLIN NUTR, (1972), vol. 25, pages 1418 - 26 | - FORESTIER C, DE CHAMPS C, VALTOUX C, JOLY B., "Probiotic activities of Lactobacillus casei rhamnosus: in vitro adherence to intestinal cells and antimicrobial properties", RES MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 152, pages 167 - 173 | - FUKUSHIMA M, NAKANO M., "Effect of a mixture of organisms, Lactobacillus acidophilus or Streptococcus faecalis on cholesterol metabolism in rats fed on a fat- and cholesterol- enriched diet", BR J NUTR, (1996), vol. 76, pages 857 - 67 | - FULLER R., "Probiotics in man and animals", J APPL BACTERIOL., (1989), vol. 66, pages 365 - 78 | - GILLILAND SE, NELSON CR, MAXWELL C., "Assimilation of cholesterol by Lactobacillus acidophilus", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL., (1985), vol. 49, pages 377 - 81 | - "Probiotics for humans", GOLDIN BR, GORBACH SL., Probiotics, the scientific basis., CHAPMAN AND HALL, (1992), pages 355 - 76 | - GOPAL P, SULLIVAN P, SMART J., "Utilisation of galacto-oligosaccharides as selective substrate for growth by lactic acid bacteria including Bifidobacterium lactis DR 10 and Lactobacillus acidophilus DR 20", INT DAIRY J, (2001), vol. 11, pages 19 - 25 | - GOPAL PK, PRASAD J, SMART J, GILL HS., "In vitro adherence properties of Lactobacillus rhamnosus DR20 and Bifidobacterium lactis DR10 strain and their antagonistic activity against an eterotoxigenic Escherichia coli", INT J FOOD MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 67, pages 207 - 16 | - GORBACH SL, CHANG TW, GOLDIN B., "Successful treatment of relapsing Clostridium difficile colitis with Lactobacillus GG", LANCET., (1987), vol. 2, page 1519 | - GORDON JI, HOOPER LV, MCNEVIN MS, WONG M, BRY L., "Epithelial cell growth and differentiation.lll. promoting diversity in the intestine: conversations between the microflora, epithelium, and diffuse GALT", AM J PHYSIOL GASTROINTEST LIVER PHYSIOL, (1997), vol. 273, pages G565 - G70 | - GOTZ V, ROMANKIEWICZ JA, MOSS J, MURRAY HW., "Prophylaxis against ampicillin- associated diarrhea with a lactobacillus preparation", AM J HOSP PHARM., (1979), vol. 36, pages 754 - 7 | - GRUPA P, ANDREW H, KIRSCHNER BS ET AL., "Is Lactobacillus GG helpful in children with Crohn's disease? Results of preliminary, open-label study", J PEDIATR GASTROENTEROL NUTR, (2000), vol. 31, pages 453 - 457 | - GULEWICZ P, SZYMANIEC S, BUBAK B, FRIAS J, "Vidal-Valverde C, Trajanowska K, Gulewicz K. Biological activity of a-galactoside preparations from Lupinus angustifolius L and Pisum sativum L seeds", J AGR FOOD CHEM, (2002), vol. 50, pages 384 - 389 | - HARMS HK, BERTELE-HARMS RM, BRUER-KLEIS D., "Enzyme-substitution therapy with the yeast Saccharomyces cerevisiae in congenital sucrase-isomaltase deficiency", N ENGL J MED., (1987), vol. 316, pages 1306 - 9 | - HARMSEN HJ, WILDEBOER-VELOO AC, RAANGS GC, WAGENDORP AA, KLIJN N, BINDELS JG, WELLING GW., "Analysis of intestinal flora development in breast-fed and formula-fed infants by using molecular identification and detection methods", J PEDIATR GASTROENTEROL NUTR, (2000), vol. 30, pages 61 - 67 | - HEERDT BG, HOUSTON MA, AUGENLICHT LH., "Short-chain fatty acid-initiated cell cycle arrest and apoptosis of colonic epithelial cells is linked to mitochondrial function", CELL GROWTH DIFFER, (1997), vol. 8, pages 523 - 532 | - HEILING HG, ZOETENDAL EG, VAUGHAN EE, MARTEU P, AKKERMANS AD, DE VOS WM., "Molecular diversity of Lactobacillus spp. And other lactic acid bacteria in the human intestine as determined by specific amplification of 16S ribosomal DNA", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2002), vol. 68, pages 114 - 123 | - HENRIKSSON A, KHALED AKD, PL CONWAY., "Lactobacillus colonization of the gastrointestinal tract of mice after removal of the non secreting stomach region", MICROB ECOL HEALTH DIS, (1999), vol. 11, pages 96 - 9 | - HILTON E, KOLAKOWSKI P, SINGER C, SMITH M., "Efficacy of Lactobacillus GG as a Diarrheal Preventive in Travelers", J TRAVEL MED., (1997), vol. 4, pages 41 - 43 | - HOCHTER W, CHASE D, HEGENHOFF G., "Saccharomyces boulardii in treatment of acute adult diarrhea. Efficacy and tolerance of treatment", MUNCH MED WOCHEN, (1990), vol. 132, pages 188 - 92 | - HOLZAPFEI,W.H., HABERER,P., SNEI,J., SCHILLINGER,U., HUISIN'TVEID,J.H.J., "Overviewofgutflora and probiotics", LNTER-NATIONALJOURNALOFFOODMICROBIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 41, pages 85 - 101 | - HOPKINS M, CUMMINGS H, MCFARLANE G., "Interspecies differences in maximum specific growth rates and cell yields of bifidobacteria cultured on oligosaccharides and other simple carbohydrate source", J APPL MICROBIOL, (1998), vol. 85, pages 381 - 386 | - ISOLAURI E, SALMINEN S, "Probiotics, gut inflammation and barrier function", GASTROENTERO CLIN NORTH AM, (2005), vol. 34, pages 437 - 450 | - IWAMOTO M, KOJI T, MAKIYAMA K ET AL., "Apoptosis of crypt epithelial cells in ulcerative colitis", J PATHOL, (1996), vol. 180, pages 152 - 159 | - JACK RW, TAGG JR, RAY B., "Bacteriocins of gram positive bacteria", MICROBIOL REV, (1995), vol. 59, pages 171 - 200 | - JANKOWSKA A, LAUBITZ D, ANTUSHEVICH H, ZABIELSKI R, GRZESIUK E., "Competition of Lactobacillus paracasei with Salmonella enterica for adhesion to Caco-2 cells", J BIOMED BIOTECHNOL 2008, (2008), page 357964 | - JIN LZ, HO WY, ABDULLAH N, JALALUDIN S., "Acid and bile tolerance of Lactobacillus isolated from chicken intestine", LETT. APPL. MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 27, pages 183 - 185 | - JOBIN C, SARTOR RB, "The IkB/NF-kB system: a key determinat of mucosal inflammation and protection", AM J PHYSIOL CELL PHYSIOL, (2000), vol. 278, pages C451 - C462 | - JULIA M, WONG RD, RUSSELL DE SOUZA RD, CYRIL W ET AL., "Colonia health: fermantation and short Chain fatty acids", J CLIN GASTROENTEROL, (2006), vol. 40, pages 235 - 243 | - KALLIOMAKI MA, ISOLAURI E., "Probiotics and down-regulation of the allergic response", LMMUNOL ALLERGY CLIN NORTH AM, (2004), vol. 24, pages 739 - 752 | - KELSALL B, BIRON C, SHARMA O, KAYE P., "Dendritic cells at the host-pathogen interface", NAT IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 3, pages 699 - 702 | - KLAENHAMMER TR., "Genetics of bacteriocins produced by acid lactic bacteria", FEMS MICROBIOL REV, (1993), vol. 12, pages 39 - 85 | - KO JS, YANG HR, CHANG JY, SEO JK., "Lactobacillus plantarum inhibits epithelial barrier dysfunction and interleukin-8 secretion induced by tumor necrosis factor-a", WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (2007), vol. 13, pages 1962 - 65 | - KOLLARITSCH H, HOIST H, GROBARA P ET AL., "Prophylaxe der reisediarrhoe mith Saccharomyces boulardii", FORST CHR MED, (1993), vol. 111, pages 152 - 56 | - KOSHIJI M, ADACHI Y, SOGO S., "Apoptosis of colorectal adenocarcinoma (COL0201) by tumour necrosis factor alpha (TNF-alpha) and/or interferon -qamma(IFN-qamma), resulting from down-regulation of Bcl-2 expression", CLIN EXP IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 1, no. 11, pages 211 - 218 | - KULKAMI N, ZANG E, KELLOFF G., "Effect of the chemopreventive agents piroxicam and D,L-alpha-difluoromethylomithine on intermediate biomarkers of colon carcinogenesis", CARCINOGENESIS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 995 - 1000 | - KURMANN J., "Started for fermented milk: Started with selected intestinal bacteria", BULL INT DAIRY FED, (1988), vol. 227, pages 41 - 45 | - LEE Y-K, SALMINEN S., "The coming age of probiotics", TRENDS FOOD SCI TECHNOL, (1995), vol. 6, pages 241 - 5 | - LEE,Y.K., PUONG,K.Y., OUWEHAND,A.C, SALMINEN, S., "Displacement of bacterial pathogens from mucus and Caco-2 cell surface by lactobacilli", J MED MICROBIO, (2003), vol. 52, pages 925 - 930 | - LEWIS R, GORBACH S., "Modificaron of bile acids by intestinal bacteria", ARCH INTERN MED, (1972), vol. 130, pages 545 - 9 | - LIN MY, YEN CL, CHEN SH., "Management of lactose maldigestion by consuming milk containing lactobacilli", DIG DIS SCI., (1998), vol. 43, pages 133 - 7 | - LIN SY, AYRES JW, WINKLER W, SANDINE WE., "Lactobacillus effects on cholesterol: in vitro and in vivo results", J DAIRY RES, (1989), vol. 72, pages 885 - 9 | - MADSEN K, CORNISH A, SOPER P ET AL., "Probiotic bacteria enhance murine and human intestinal epithelial barrier function", GATROENTEROLOGY, (2001), vol. 121, pages 580 - 591 | - MAHE S, MARTEAU P, HUNEAU JF, THUILLIER F, TOME D., "Intestinal nitrogen and electrolyte movements following fermented milk ingestion in man", BR J NUTR., (1994), vol. 71, pages 169 - 80 | - MAKRAS L, VAN ACKER G, DE VUYST L., "Lactobacillus paracasei subsp. Paracasei 8700:2 degrades inulin-type fructans exhibiting different degrees of polymerization", APPL ENVIRO MICROBIOL, (2005), vol. 71, pages 6531 - 6537 | - MARINI M, BAMIAS G, RIVERA-NIEVES J., "TNF-D neutralization ameliorates the severity of murine Crohn's-like ileitis by abrogation of intestinal epithelial cell apoptosis", PROC NATI ACAD SCI USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 8366 - 8371 | - MARTEAU P, FLOURIE B, POCHART P, CHASTANG C, DESJEUX JF, RAMBAUD JC., "Effect of the microbial lactase (EC 3.2.1.23) activity in yoghurt on the intestinal absorption of lactose: an in vivo study in lactase-deficient humans", BR J NUTR., (1990), vol. 64, pages 71 - 9 | - MCFARLAND LV, SURAWICZ CM, GREENBERG RN ET AL., "Prevention de (?-lactam associated diarrhea by Saccharomyces boulardii compared with placebo", AM J GASTROENTEROL, (1995), vol. 90, pages 439 - 48 | - MEDINA R, KATZ M, GONZALEZ S, OLIVER G., "Characterization of the lactic acid bacteria in ewes milk and cheese from northwest Argentina", J FOOD PROT, (2001), vol. 64, pages 559 - 563 | - MEDINA V, EDMONDS B, YOUNG G, JAMES R, APPLETON S, ZALEWSKI P., INDUCTION OF CASPASE-3 PROTEASE ACTIVITY AND APOPTOSIS BY BUTYRATE AND TRICHOSTATIN A ( INHIBITORS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE):DEPENDENCE ON PROTEIN SYNTHESIS AND SYNERGY WITH A MITOCHONDRIAL/CYTOCHROME C-DEPENDENT PATWAY, (1997), vol. 57, pages 3697 - 3707 | - METCHNIKOFF E., "Etudes sur la flore intestinale", ANN. INST. PASTEUR PARIS, (1908), vol. 22, pages 929 - 55 | - MORATA DE AMBROSINI, GANZALEZ,S.N., OLIVER,G., "Study of adhesion of Lactobacillus casei CRL431 to ileal intestinal cells of mice", J.FOODPROT., (1999), pages 1430 - 1434 | - NANNO M, MOROTOMI M, TAKAYAMA H, KUROSHIMA T, TANAKA R, MUTAI M., "Mutagenic activation of biliary metabolites of benzo(a)pyrene by b-glucoronidase-positive bacteria in human faeces", J MED MICROBIOL, (1986), vol. 22, page 351 | - NAVARRO E, SIMONET P, NORMARD P, BARDIN R., "Characterization of natural populations of Nitrobacter spp. using PCR/RFLP analyses of the ribosomal intergenic spacer", ARCH MICROBIOL, (1992), vol. 157, pages 107 - 115 | - NEBRA Y, BLANCH AR, "A new selective medium for Bifidobacterium spp", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL., (1999), vol. 65, pages 5173 - 6 | - NIEDERGANG F, KWEON M., "New trends in antigen uptake in the gut mucosa", TRENDS MICROBIOL, (2005), vol. 13, pages 485 - 90 | - OHARA A, O'REGAN P, FANNING A, OMAHONY C, MACSHARRY J, LYONS A, BIENENSTOCK J, OMAHONY L, SANAN F., "Functional modulation of human intestinal epithelial cell responses by Bifidobacterium inf antis and Lactobacillus salivarius", IMMUNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 118, pages 202 - 15 | - OTLES S, CAGINDI O, AKCICEK E, "Probiotics and health", ASIAN PAC J CANCER PREV, (2003), vol. 4, pages 369 - 372 | - OUWEHAND,A C., KIRJAVAINEN,P.V., SHORTT,C., SALMINEN,S., "Probiotics: mechanisms and establishe deffects", INTERN DAIRY J, (1999), vol. 9, pages 43 - 52 | - PERCY-ROBB IW, COLLEE JG., "Bile acids: a pH dependent antibacterial system in the gut?", BR MED J, (1972), vol. 3, pages 813 - 5 | - PIAIA M, ANTOINE JM, MATEOS-GUARDIA JA, LEPLIGARD A, LENOIR-WIJNKOOP I., "Assessment of the benefits of live yogurt methods and markers for in vivo studies of the physiological effects of yogurt cultures", MICROB ECOL HEALTH DIS, (2003), vol. 15, pages 79 - 87 | - PICKARD KM, BREMNER AR, GORDON JN ET AL., "Microbial-gut interactions in health and disease. Immune responses", BEST PRACT RES CLIN GASTROENTEROL., (2004), vol. 18, pages 271 - 285 | - PLANT, LJ., CONWAY,P.L., "Adjuvant properties and coloniza-tion potential of adhering and non-adhering Lactobacillus spp. Following oral administration to mice", FEMS IMMUNOL MED MICROBIO, (2002), vol. 34, pages 105 - 111 | - RATAJCZAK C, DUEZ C, GRANGETTE C, POCHARD P, TONNEL AB, PESTEL J., "Impact of lactic acid bacteria on dendritic cells from allergic patients in an experimental model of intestinal epithelium", J BIOMED BIOTECHNOL, (2007), vol. 1, pages 719 - 21 | - RIEDEL C, FOATA F, PHILIPPE D, ADOLFSSON O, EIKMANNS B, BLUM S., "Anti-inflammatory effects of bifidobacteria by inhibition of LPS-induced NF-kB activation", WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (2006), vol. 12, pages 3729 - 35 | - RIMOLDI M, CHIEPPA M, SALUCCI V, AVOGADRI F, SONZOGNI A, SAMPIETRO G, NESPOLIA, VIALE G, ALLAVENA P, RESCIGNO M., "Intestinal immune homeostasis is regulated by the crosstalk between epithelial cells and dendritic cells", NAT IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 6, pages 507 - 14 | - RIOUX KP, FEDORAK RN., "Probiotics in the treatment of inflammatory bowel disease", J CLIN GASTROENTEROL, (2006), vol. 40, pages 260 - 263 | - ROBERFROID M, VAN LOO E, GIBSON R., "The bifidogenic nature of chicory inulin and its hydrolysis products", J NUTR, (1998), vol. 128, pages 11 - 19 | - ROSS RP, DESMOND C, FITZGERALD GF, STATON C ., "Overcoming the technological hurdles in the development of probiotic food", J. APPL. MICROBIOL., (2005), vol. 98, pages 1410 - 17 | - SAB16N E, CONTRERAS B, VANDAMME E., "Antimicrobial peptide of lactic acid bacteria: mode of action, genetics and biosynthesis", ADV BIOCHEM ENG BIOTECHNOL, (2000), vol. 68, pages 21 - 60 | - SATOKARI RM, VAUGHAN EE, FAVIER C, DORE J, EDWARDS C, DE VOS WM., "Diversity of Bifidobacterium and Lactobacillus spp. in breast-fed and formula-fed infants as assessed by 16S rDNA sequence differences", MICROBIOL ECOL HEALTH DIS, (2002), vol. 14, pages 97 - 105 | - SAVAGE DC., "Microbial ecology of the gastrointestinal tract", ANNU REV MICROBIOL, (1977), vol. 31, no. 31, pages 107 - 33 | - SENMEIR J, DEVRESE M., "Probiotics, prebiotics, and Synbiotics, approaching a definition", AM J CLIN NUTR, (2001), vol. 73, no. 361, page 64 | - SERVIN A., "Antagonistic activities of lactobacilli and bifidobacteria against microbial pathogens", FEMS MICROBIOL REV, (2004), vol. 28, pages 405 - 440 | - SIITONEN S, VAPAATALO H, SALMINEN S, GORDIN A, SAXELIN M, WIKBERG R, KIRKKOLA AL., "Effect of Lactobacillus GG yoghurt in prevention of antibiotic associated diarrhea", ANN MED., (1990), vol. 22, pages 57 - 9 | - SILVAM, JACOBS NV, DENEKE C, GORBACH SL., ANTIMICROBIAL SUBSTANCE FRO A HUMAN LACTOBACILLUS STRAIN: ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1987), vol. 31, pages 1231 - 33 | - SING J, RVENSON A, TOMITA M, SHIMAMURA S, ISHIBASHI N, REDDY B., "Bifidobacterium longum, a lactic acid-producing intestinal bacterium inhibits colon cancer and modulates the intermediate biomarkers of colon carcinogenesis", CARCINOGENESIS, (1997), vol. 18, pages 833 - 41 | - CINNRRNPA FA, RODDEY G, ME DONNELL TJ, "Increased apoptosis accompanies neoplastic development in the human colorectum", CLIN CANCER RES, (1996), vol. 2, pages 1999 - 2006 | - SNELLING AM, "Effects of probiotics on the gastrointestinal tract", CURR OPIN INFECI DIS, (2005), vol. 18, page 420A126 | - SPINIER, J. K., TAWEECHOTIPATR, M., ROGNERUD, C. L., OUB, C. N., TUMWASORN, S., VERSALOVIC, J., "Human-derived probiotic Lactobacillus reuteri demonstrate antimicrobial activities targeting diverse enteric bacterial pathogens", ANAEROBE, (2008), vol. 14, pages 166 - 171 | - STEINER TS, NATARO JP, POTEET-SMITH CE, SMITH JA, GUERRANT RL., "Enteroaggregative Escherichia coli expresses a novel flagellin that causes IL-8 release from intestinal epithelial cells", J CLIN INVEST, (2000), vol. 105, pages 1769 - 77 | - STEWART L, PELLEGRINI CA, WAY LW., "Antibacterial activity of bile acids against common biliary tract organisms", SURG FORUM, (1986), vol. 37, pages 157 - 9 | - SURAWICZ CM, ELMER GW, SPEELMAN P, MCFARLAND LV, CHINN J, VAN BELLE G., "Prevention of antibiotic associated diarrhoea by Saccharomyces boulardii: Aprospective study", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1989), vol. 96, pages 981 - 88 | - TARANTO MP, MEDICI M, PERDIGON G, RUIZ HOLGADO AP, VALDEZ GF., "Evidence for hypocholesterolemic effect of Lactobacillus reuteri in hypercholesterolemic mice", J DAIRY SCI., (1998), vol. 81, pages 2336 - 40 | - TIEN MT, GIRARDIN S, REGNAULT B, LE BOURHIS L, DILLIES M, COPPEE JY, BOURDET-SICARD R, SANSONETTI P, PEDRON T., "Anti-Inflammatory effect of Lactobacillus casei on Shigella-Infected Human Intestinal Epithelial Cells", J IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 176, pages 1228 - 37 | - TODORIKI K, MUKAI T, SATO S, TOBA T., "Inhibition of adhesion of food-bome pathogens o Caco-2 cells by Lactobacillus strains", J APPL MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 91, pages 154 - 9 | - TSAI C, LIN P, HSIEH Y., "Three Lactobacillus strains from healthy infant stool inhibit enterotoxigenic Escherichia coli grown in vitro", ANAEROBE, (2008), vol. 14, pages 61 - 7 | - TUOMOLA EM, SALMINEN SJ., "Adhesion of some probiotic and dairy Lactobacillus strains to Caco-2 cell cultures", INT J FOOD MICROBIOL, (1998), vol. 41, pages 45 - 51 | - VAN LOO J, CUMMINGS J, DELZENNE N, ENGLYST H, FRANCK A, HOPKINS M, KOK N, MACFARLANE G, NEWTON D, QUIGLEY M, "Functional food properties of nondigestibles oligosaccharides a consensus report from the ENDO project (DGXII AI-RII-CT94-1095", BRJ NUTR, (1999), vol. 81, pages 121 - 132 | - VANDERHOOF JA, WHITNEY DB, ANTONSON DL, HANNER TL, LUPO JV, YOUNG RJ., LACTOBACILLUS GG, "prevention of antibiotic-associated diarrhea in children", J PEDIATR., (1999), vol. 135, pages 564 - 8 | - WALLACE T, BRADLEY S, BUCKLEY N, GREEN-JOHNSON JM., "Interactions of lactic acid bacteria with human intestinal epithelial cells: effects on cytokine production", J FOOD PROTECT, (2003), vol. 66, pages 466 - 72 | - WANG S, NG L, CHOW WL, LEE YK., "Infant intestinal enterococcus faecalis down- regulates inflammatory responses in human intestinal cell lines", WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (2008), vol. 14, pages 1067 - 76 | - WEITZMAN SA, GORDON LI., "Inflammation and cancer: role of phagocyte-generated oxidants in carcinogenesis", BLOOD, (1990), vol. 76, pages 655 - 66 | - WUNDERLICH PF, BRAUN L, FUMAGALLI I, D'APUZZO V, HEIM F, KARLY M, LODI R, POLITTA G, VONBANK F, ZELTNER L., "Double-blind report on the efficacy of lactic acid-producing Enterococcus SF68 in the prevention of antibiotic-associated diarrhoea and in the treatment of acute diarrhoea", J INT MED RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 333 - 8 | - YAN F, POLK D., "Probiotic bacterium prevents cytokine-induced apoptosis in intestinal epithelial cells", J BIOLOG CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 50959 - 50965 | - ZHANG L, LI N, CAICEDO R, NEU J., "Alive and dead Lactobacillus rhamnosus GG decrease tumor necrosis factor-a-induced interleukin-8 production in Caco-2 cells", J NUTR, (2005), vol. 135, pages 1752 - 56 |