EP2406377 - A POLYNUCLEOTIDE AND POLYPEPTIDE SEQUENCE AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bigtec Private Limited II Floor SID Entrepreneurship Building Indian Institute of Science (IISc) Campus Malleshwaram Bangalore 560012, Karnataka / IN | [2016/01] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Bigtec Private Limited II Floor SID Entrepreneurship Building Indian Institute of Science (IISc) Campus Malleshwaram Bangalore 560012, Karnataka / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANOJ, Mulakkapurath, Narayanan c/o. Bigtec Private Limited II Floor SID Entrepreneurship Building Indian Institute of Science (IISc)Campus, Malleshwaram Bangalore 560 012 Karnataka / IN | 02 /
VASAMSETTY, Venkata, Ramachandra, Rao c/o Bigtec Private Limited II Floor SID Entrepreneurship Building Indian Institute of Science (IISc)Campus, Malleshwaram Bangalore 560 012 Karnataka / IN | 03 /
BALIGA, Madhuri c/o Bigtec Private Limited II Floor SID Entrepreneurship Building Indian Institute of Science (IISc)Campus, Malleshwaram Bangalore 560 012 Karnataka / IN | 04 /
KUMAR, Kirubakaran, Naveen c/o Bigtec Private Limited II Floor SID Entrepreneurship Building Indian Institute of Science (IISc)Campus, Malleshwaram Bangalore 560 012 Karnataka / IN | 05 /
NAIR, Chandrasekhar, Bhaskaran c/o Bigtec Private Limited II Floor SID Entrepreneurship Building Indian Institute of Science (IISc)Campus, Malleshwaram Bangalore 560 012 Karnataka / IN | 06 /
SUBBARAO, Pillarisetti, Venkata c/o Bigtec Private Limited II Floor SID Entrepreneurship Building Indian Institute of Science (IISc)Campus, Malleshwaram Bangalore 560 012 Karnataka / IN | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2016/01] |
Former [2014/16] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2013/10] | Gillet, Raphaëlle, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2012/03] | Nevant, Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10750465.6 | 12.03.2010 | [2016/01] | WO2010IN00144 | Priority number, date | IN2009CHE0567 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: IN CH05672009 | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010103546 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2406377 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2406377 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/17, C07K1/107, C07K1/18, C07K1/20, C07K1/34, C07K1/36, C07K14/62, C12N15/81, C12R1/84 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
C07K14/62 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/62 (KR);
C07K1/18 (US);
C07K19/00 (KR);
C12N15/101 (KR);
C12N15/81 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2012/03] | C12N15/17, C07K1/107, C07K1/18, C07K1/20, C07K1/34, C07K1/36, C07K14/62, C12N15/81 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYNUKLEOTID- UND POLYPEPTIDSEQUENZ SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/03] | English: | A POLYNUCLEOTIDE AND POLYPEPTIDE SEQUENCE AND METHODS THEREOF | [2012/03] | French: | SÉQUENCE POLYNUCLÉOTIDIQUE ET POLYPEPTIDIQUE ET SES PROCÉDÉS | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 10.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 26.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2010 | AT | 06.01.2016 | BE | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | IE | 12.03.2016 | LU | 12.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.03.2010 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.03.2010 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 12.03.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
BE | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 12.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8902463 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [A] 1,2,10-15* figure 7 *; | [A]WO9937793 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1,2,10-15 * sequence 2 * * page 12 * * example 1 *; | [A] - EGEL-MITANI M ET AL, "Competitive expression of two heterologous genes inserted into one plasmid in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 73, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-1119(88)90317-4, ISSN 0378-1119, (19881215), pages 113 - 120, (19881215), XP025705274 [A] 1,2,10-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(88)90317-4 | [A] - MANUEL MANSUR ET AL, "Multiple gene copy number enhances insulin precursor secretion in the yeast Pichia pastoris", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, DORDRECHT, (20050301), vol. 27, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S10529-005-1007-7, ISSN 1573-6776, pages 339 - 345, XP019231101 [A] 1,2,10-15 * page 340, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10529-005-1007-7 | International search | [X]US2004067874 (MARKUSSEN JAN [DK], et al); | [X] - ZHONG, G. ET AL., "Pilot-scale production and purification of staphylokinase-based fusion protein over-expressed in Escherichia coli", FRONTIERS IN BIOLOGY CHINA., (200902), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 75 - 81, XP008167044 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11515-008-0085-z | [X] - ZERHOUNI, S. ET AL., "Purification and characterization of papaya glutamine cyclotransferase, a plant enzyme highly resistant to chemical, acid and thermal denaturation", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (199809), vol. 1387, no. 1-2, pages 275 - 290, XP027288049 | [L] - HAMADA, J., "Peptides: Purification with Immobilized Enzymes", ENCYCLOPAEDIA OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, FLORIDA, (2005), vol. 2, no. 2ND, pages 1226 - 1228, XP008167079 | by applicant | WO9937793 | - EGEL-MITANI ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 73, pages 113 - 120 |