EP2407232 - EXHAUST GAS PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING EXHAUST GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Oil & Energy Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8162 / JP | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMURA, Ken c/o JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008162 / JP | 02 /
OHUCHI, Tai c/o JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008162 / JP | 03 /
ASANO, Tsuyoshi c/o JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008162 / JP | 04 /
OKABE, Takashi c/o JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORPORATION 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008162 / JP | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2013/44] |
Former [2012/03] | Blokland, Arie Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10750603.2 | 11.03.2010 | WO2010JP01766 | Priority number, date | JP20090059504 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009059504 | [2012/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010103847 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2407232 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/46, C01B3/56, C01B33/04, H01L21/205 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
C01B33/04 (EP,US);
B01D53/0462 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
B01D53/46 (EP,US);
C23C16/4412 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/104 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2253/112 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2256/16 (EP,US);
B01D2257/553 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0216 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40056 (EP,US);
B01D2259/403 (EP,US);
Y02C20/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | ABGASBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ABGASBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | [2012/03] | English: | EXHAUST GAS PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING EXHAUST GAS | [2012/03] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TRAITER UN GAZ D'ÉVACUATION | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2011 | Translation filed | 11.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH07253272 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JP2001342566 (TANAKA PRECIOUS METAL IND); | [Y]JPH11191422 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JP2005108805 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2005116255 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001353420 (OSAKA OXYGEN IND); | [Y]JP2002001047 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | by applicant | JPS61186212 | JPS62134414 | JPH09239239 |