EP2407466 - PIPERAZINE COMPOUND CAPABLE OF INHIBITING PROSTAGLANDIN D SYNTHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): MT | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-27 Kandanishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1018444 / JP | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URADE, Yoshihiro c/o OSAKA BIOSCIENCE INSTITUTE 6-2-4, Furuedai Suita-shi Osaka 565-0874 / JP | 02 /
KITADE, Makoto c/o TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1-27, Misugidai Hanno-shi Saitama 357-8527 / JP | 03 /
SHIGENO, Kazuhiko c/o TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1-27, Misugidai Hanno-shi Saitama 357-8527 / JP | 04 /
YAMANE, Keiko c/o TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1-27, Misugidai Hanno-shi Saitama 357-8527 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Katsunao c/o TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1-27, Misugidai Hanno-shi Saitama 357-8527 / JP | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/02] |
Former [2012/03] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10750777.4 | 08.03.2010 | [2016/02] | WO2010JP53760 | Priority number, date | JP20090055721 | 09.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009055721 | [2012/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010104024 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2407466 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2407466 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, A61K31/496, A61K31/5377, A61P1/04, A61P3/04, A61P7/04, A61P9/00, A61P11/00, A61P11/06, A61P15/00, A61P15/06, A61P15/08, A61P17/00, A61P17/04, A61P17/06, A61P17/10, A61P19/02, A61P21/00, A61P21/04, A61P25/00 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D207/34 (EP,US);
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
C07D277/82 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIPERAZINVERBINDUNG ZUR PROSTAGLANDIN-D-SYNTHASE-HEMMUNG | [2012/03] | English: | PIPERAZINE COMPOUND CAPABLE OF INHIBITING PROSTAGLANDIN D SYNTHASE | [2012/03] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE PIPÉRAZINE CAPABLE D'INHIBER LA PROSTAGLANDINE D SYNTHASE | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2011 | Translation filed | 05.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 29.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | SM | 13.01.2016 | LU | 08.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/28] | CY | 13.01.2016 | |
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | EE | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | EE | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | EE | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | HR | 13.01.2016 | |
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | HR | 13.01.2016 | |
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | HR | 13.01.2016 | |
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | HR | 13.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2001288160 (SHIONOGI & CO); | [A]JP2006508077 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC.); | [A]WO2008122787 (EVOTEC AG [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO9907672 | WO2007007778 | WO2007041634 | WO2007054623 | WO2008023720 | WO2008122787 | - J. IMMUNOL., (1982), vol. 129, pages 1627 - 1631 | - N. ENG. J. MED., (1986), vol. 315, pages 800 - 804 | - N. ENG. J. MED., (1984), vol. 311, pages 209 - 213 | - ARCH. OTOLARYNGOL HEAD NECK SURG., (2007), vol. 133, pages 693 - 700 | - ACTA NEUROPATHOL., (2002), vol. 104, pages 377 - 384 | - AIR. J PATHOL., (2009), vol. 174, no. 5, pages 1735 - 1744 | - IYAKUHIN NO KAIHATSU, Development of Pharmaceuticals, HIROKAWA PUBLISHING, (1990), vol. 7, pages 163 - 198 | - URADE, Y. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 3820 - 3825 | - MUSCLE NERVE., (2007), vol. 35, pages 43 - 48 |