EP2454321 - POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE COMPOSITION WITH AN IMPROVED IMPACT RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/21] | POLYHYDROALKANOATE COMPOSITION EXHIBITING IMPROVED IMPACT RESISTANCE | ||
[2014/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2015/02] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUILLOUX, Alain 8 Route du Bigobert F-27300 Saint-leger De Rotes / FR | 02 /
QUINEBECHE, Sébastien 12 rue Herleue F-27300 Bernay / FR | 03 /
GIROIS, Stephane 7 Allée du Haut Garel F-69530 Brignais / FR | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/08] |
Former [2012/21] | Gavin, Pablo ARKEMA FRANCE Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10752003.3 | 13.07.2010 | WO2010FR51471 | Priority number, date | FR20090054956 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: FR 0954956 | FR20100051020 | 15.02.2010 Original published format: FR 1051020 | [2012/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011007092 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2454321 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2454321 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/04 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
B29C48/397 (EP,US);
C08L23/0884 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L55/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS POLYHYDROXYALKANSÄURE MIT VERBESSERTER SCHLAGFESTIGKEIT | [2014/41] | English: | POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE COMPOSITION WITH AN IMPROVED IMPACT RESISTANCE | [2014/41] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYHYDROALKANOATE PRESENTANT UNE RESISTANCE AU CHOC AMELIOREE | [2012/21] |
Former [2012/21] | POLYHYDROALKANOATZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERBESSERTER SCHLAGFESTIGKEIT | ||
Former [2012/21] | POLYHYDROALKANOATE COMPOSITION EXHIBITING IMPROVED IMPACT RESISTANCE | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 20.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2010 | AL | 07.01.2015 | AT | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | ES | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | SM | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | IE | 13.07.2015 | LU | 13.07.2015 | BE | 31.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 13.07.2010 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PT | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 13.07.2010 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 13.07.2010 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
LU | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 07.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2005059031 (DU PONT [US], et al) [AD] 1-17* page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 15 *; | [A]FR2902434 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 9; example - *; | [A]EP1881036 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, paragraph 10 *; | [AD]US2008071008 (SMILLIE BENJAMIN ANDREW [CA], et al) [AD] 1-17 * page 1, paragraphs 3-5 *; | [AP]WO2009131079 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [AP] 1-17 * page 2, lines 10-27 * | Examination | EP2113532 | EP2199341 | by applicant | US2668162 | US3287443 | US3297033 | US3657391 | US3808180 | US3985704 | US4096202 | US4180494 | US4260693 | US4299928 | EP0270865 | JPH03502115 | JPH0726001 | JPH0753684 | JPH09316310 | US5773520 | WO2005059031 | US2008071008 |