EP2470795 - TURBINE ENGINE CASING HAVING A REINFORCED SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Safran Launchers SAS 60-62 rue Camille Desmoulins 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/03] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Snecma 2 Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUFFLERT, Sébastien 1 rue Gustave Bertinot F-27400 Louviers / FR | 02 /
BOURDIN, Philippe 15 impasse des Pommiers F-27950 Saint Just / FR | 03 /
LANGLOIS, Vincent 6 rue Saint Georges 2ème Etage F-71100 Chalon-sur-Saône / FR | 04 /
FAYOLLE, Patrice 2 rue du Cailloutin F-27950 Saint Marcel / FR | [2015/07] |
Former [2012/27] | 01 /
BOUFFLERT, Sébastien 1 rue Gustave Bertinot F-27400 Louviers / FR | ||
02 /
BOURDIN, Philippe 15 impasse des Pommiers F-27950 Saint Just / FR | |||
03 /
LANGLOIS, Vincent 12 rue Grande F-27400 La Haye-Malherbe / FR | |||
04 /
FAYOLLE, Patrice 2 rue du Cailloutin F-27950 Saint Marcel / FR | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2016/48] |
Former [2013/17] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2012/27] | Barbin le Bourhis, Joël, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10752062.9 | 21.07.2010 | [2016/48] | WO2010FR51536 | Priority number, date | FR20090055778 | 25.08.2009 Original published format: FR 0955778 | [2012/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011023873 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2470795 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2470795 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/42 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
F04D29/426 (EP);
F04D29/42 (US);
F05D2260/39 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBINENMOTORGEHÄUSE MIT VERSTÄRKTER ABDICHTUNG | [2012/27] | English: | TURBINE ENGINE CASING HAVING A REINFORCED SEAL | [2012/27] | French: | CARTER DE TURBOMACHINE A ETANCHEITE RENFORCEE | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 30.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2010 | AL | 30.11.2016 | AT | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | HR | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | MK | 30.11.2016 | MT | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | SM | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | BG | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | IS | 30.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | GB | 21.07.2017 | IE | 21.07.2017 | LU | 21.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.07.2010 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.07.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.07.2010 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.07.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.07.2010 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.07.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.07.2010 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.07.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.07.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.07.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.07.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.07.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
LU | 21.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.07.2017 | ||
IE | 21.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 21.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
HR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1571349 (VOGEL PUMPEN [AT]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [I]WO2007048205 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [I] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0108]; figures 23,31-33 *; | [A]DE102007009781 (WOCO INDUSTRIETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |