EP2588696 - DAMPER AND RETRACTING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EKU AG Wilerstrasse 90 8370 Sirnach / CH | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTHER, Marco Fischingerstrasse 4 CH-8372 Wiezikon / CH | 02 /
GÄMPERLE, Walter Austrasse 32 CH-9242 Oberuzwil / CH | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 Postfach 8501 Frauenfeld 1 / CH | ||
Former [2013/19] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 10752266.6 | 31.08.2010 | WO2010CH00212 | Priority number, date | CH20100001081 | 02.07.2010 Original published format: CH 10812010 | [2015/49] |
Former [2013/19] | CH20100000081 | 02.07.2010 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012000120 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588696 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588696 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/32] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2588696 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E05F1/16, E05F5/00, E05F5/02 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
E05F5/003 (EP);
E05F1/16 (EP);
E05Y2201/21 (EP);
E05Y2201/412 (EP);
E05Y2600/46 (EP);
E05Y2800/23 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/19] | E05F5/00, E05F5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMPFER- UND EINZIEHANORDNUNG | [2013/19] | English: | DAMPER AND RETRACTING ARRANGEMENT | [2013/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AMORTISSEMENT ET DE TRACTION | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 27.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2010 | AL | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | ES | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | HR | 05.08.2015 | LT | 05.08.2015 | LV | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | MK | 05.08.2015 | MT | 05.08.2015 | NL | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | SM | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | IE | 31.08.2015 | LU | 31.08.2015 | FR | 05.10.2015 | GB | 05.11.2015 | NO | 05.11.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | IS | 05.12.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 31.08.2010 | |
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MK | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 05.10.2015 | ||
GB | 05.11.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 31.08.2010 | |
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 05.10.2015 | ||
GB | 05.11.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 31.08.2010 | |
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 05.10.2015 | ||
GB | 05.11.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 05.10.2015 | ||
GB | 05.11.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 05.10.2015 | ||
GB | 05.11.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 31.08.2015 | ||
GB | 05.11.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
IE | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 05.08.2015 | |
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 05.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2009076785 (EKU AG [CH], et al) [XD] 1-5 * page 3, lines 2-7 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,3-5 * * claim 1 *; | [XA]EP2060720 (AGOSTINO FERRARI SPA [IT]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] * * figure 1 * [A] 2,3,5; | [A]DE202007014567U (HAEFELE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0012] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2009076785 |