EP2430769 - TRANSMISSION USING COMMON AND DEDICATED PILOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Rockstar Bidco LP 1285 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10019-6064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALLARD, Aaron 2663 Conn Street Ottawa Ontario K2B 7C4 / CA | 02 /
YU, Dong-Sheng 31 Westpointe Crescent Ottawa Ontario K2G 5Y9 / CA | 03 /
BALIGH, Mohammadhadi 149 Saltspring Private Kanata Ontario K2M 0B1 / CA | 04 /
MA, Jianglei 3 Bon Echo Crescent Kanata Ontario K2M 2W5 / CA | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/37] | Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/25] | Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/12] | Borton, Claire, et al Scott & York 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 10753029.7 | 16.03.2010 | [2017/37] | WO2010CA00376 | Priority number, date | US20090160452P | 16.03.2009 Original published format: US 160452 P | US20090244185P | 21.09.2009 Original published format: US 244185 P | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010105345 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2430769 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2430769 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 23.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/76, H04B7/06, H04W16/10 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
H04L5/005 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/06 (KR);
H04B1/76 (KR);
H04B7/0417 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0478 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/06 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG MIT ALLGEMEINEN UND DEDIZIERTEN PILOTEN | [2012/12] | English: | TRANSMISSION USING COMMON AND DEDICATED PILOTS | [2012/12] | French: | TRANSMISSION UTILISANT DES PILOTES COMMUNS ET DÉDIÉS | [2012/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 22.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2010 | AT | 13.09.2017 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | ES | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | IT | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MK | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | SM | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | NO | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | IE | 16.03.2018 | LU | 16.03.2018 | MT | 16.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 16.03.2010 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
MT | 16.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
MT | 16.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
MT | 16.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 16.03.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
IT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
ES | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | |
NO | 13.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008103317 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 2-7 *; | [A]WO2008041677 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-20; | EP2068479 [ ] (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0102] * * figures 10, 11 *; | [A]WO2009008180 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-20; | US2010266060 [ ] (KIMURA RYOHEI [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0043] * * figure 1 *; | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Downlink Reference Signal for Higher Order MIMO", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090218_LGE_DL-RS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090108), no. Ljubljana; 20090108, XP050318148 [A] 1-20 * page 3 * * page 5 - page 6 * * figure 4 * | [A] - NORTEL, "Discussion on RS designs for CoMP in LTE-A", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090151(NORTEL-MULTISITE_MIMO_COOPERATION_RS_DISCUSSION), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090119), no. Ljubljana; 20090119, XP050318086 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2010027153 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [A]WO2008117984 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP2068479 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) | by applicant | WO2008103317 | WO2008041677 | WO2009008180 |