EP2409271 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SELECTING A RELEVANT USER FOR INTRODUCTION TO A USER IN AN ONLINE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ifwe Inc. 840 Battery Street, 2nd Floor San Francisco, CA 94119 / US | [2015/26] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Tagged, Inc. 840 Battery Street, 2nd Floor San Francisco, CA 94119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLEIER-SMITH, Johann, M. 200 Brannan Street Apt. 419 San Francisco CA 94107 / US | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Lampis, Marco, et al Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Lampis, Marco, et al Dragotti & Associati Via Marina, 6 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10753851.4 | 25.02.2010 | WO2010US25461 | Priority number, date | US20090407746 | 19.03.2009 Original published format: US 407746 | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010107566 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2409271 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q50/40 (KR);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/403 (US);
H04W4/021 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/21 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL EINES RELEVANTEN BENUTZERS ZUR EINFÜHRUNG EINES BENUTZERS IN EINE ONLINE-UMGEBUNG | [2012/04] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SELECTING A RELEVANT USER FOR INTRODUCTION TO A USER IN AN ONLINE ENVIRONMENT | [2012/04] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SÉLECTIONNER UN UTILISATEUR PERTINENT POUR L'INTRODUIRE AUPRÈS D'UN UTILISATEUR D'UN ENVIRONNEMENT EN LIGNE | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 07.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2018 | 27.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/08] | 07.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 23.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - "STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NOTICE FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007 CONCERNING BUSINESS METHODS - EPC / ERKLAERUNG GEMAESS DER MITTEILUNG DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS VOM 1.OKTOBER 2007 UEBER GESCHAEFTSMETHODEN - EPU / DECLARATION CONFORMEMENT AU COMMUNIQUE DE L'OFFICE EUROP", 20071101, (20071101), XP007905525 [L] 1-15 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods(OJ 11/2007; p592-593) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | International search | [A]US2006121990 (O'KELLEY PATRICK W II [US], et al); | [Y]KR100643480B (EXELLENTECHNOLOGIES INC [KR]); | [Y]JP2007328723 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]US2008140650 (STACKPOLE DAVID [US]) | Examination | US2007100686 |