EP2408376 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PHOTOACOUSTIC OPHTHALMOSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/04] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PHOTOACOUSTIC OPTHALMOSCOPY | ||
[2012/17] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UWM Research Foundation, Inc. 1440 East North Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53202 / US | For all designated states University Of Southern California University Park Los Angeles, California 90089 / US | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hao, F. 99 Greenbriar Drive Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | 02 /
JIAO, Shuliang 626 North Monterey Street Apartment U Alhambra, CA 91801 / US | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10754071.8 | 17.03.2010 | WO2010US27685 | Priority number, date | US20100335684P | 11.01.2010 Original published format: US 335684 P | US20090160907P | 17.03.2009 Original published format: US 160907 P | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010107933 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2408376 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
A61B8/10 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/0095 (EP,US);
A61B8/4472 (EP,US);
G01B9/0203 (EP,US);
G01B9/02044 (EP,US);
G01B9/02091 (EP,US);
G01N29/0681 (EP,US);
G01N29/2418 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR PHOTOAKUSTISCHE OPHTHALMOSKOPIE | [2012/04] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PHOTOACOUSTIC OPHTHALMOSCOPY | [2012/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'OPHTALMOSCOPIE PHOTOACOUSTIQUE | [2012/04] |
Former [2012/04] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PHOTOACOUSTIC OPTHALMOSCOPY | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4267732 (QUATE CALVIN F); | [A]US5840023 (ORAEVSKY ALEXANDER A [US], et al); | [Y]US6652459 (PAYNE PETER ALFRED [GB], et al); | [Y]US2005070803 (CULLUM BRIAN M [US], et al); | [A]US6979292 (KANAYAMA SHOICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2006184042 (WANG LIHONG [US], et al); | [A]WO2007035934 (SKYLINE BIOMEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [A]US2007299341 (WANG LIHONG [US], et al); | [Y]US2008033262 (PEYMAN GHOLAM A [US], et al); | [Y]US2008088838 (RAICU VALERICA [US], et al); | [A]US2008123083 (WANG XUEDING [US], et al) |