EP2483108 - MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRK, Edgar Schubertstrasse 2 85591 Vaterstetten / DE | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Mayer-Martin, Christian Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-5 80788 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Mayer-Martin, Christian Bayerische Motorenwerke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10754684.8 | 03.09.2010 | WO2010EP05419 | Priority number, date | DE20091047930 | 01.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009047930 | [2012/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011038824 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2483108 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/50, B60Q5/00 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
B60Q5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2012/32] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE | [2012/32] | French: | VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 31.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2005343360 (ANDEN) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [Y]US2007257783 (MATSUMOTO KATSUNARI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,4,5 * paragraphs [0208] - [0238] - [ 410] - [0427]; figures 1-3, 25, 26 *; | [XDYI]DE102007003201 (TRZMIEL ALFRED [DE]) [XD] 1 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 24] - [0030]; figure . * [Y] 2,4,5 [I] 3 | by applicant | DE102007003201 |