EP2437701 - NON-ROLL FOAM EARTIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sperian Hearing Protection, LLC 7828 Waterville Road San Diego, CA 92154 / US | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIEMENS, Jim 28602 Rancho del Lago Laguna Niguel CA 92677 / US | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2013/08] |
Former [2012/15] | Freeman, Avi Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10755072.5 | 03.06.2010 | WO2010US37284 | Priority number, date | US20090183872P | 03.06.2009 Original published format: US 183872 P | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010141741 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2437701 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F11/08, A61F11/12, B29C44/12, C08J9/00 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
A61F11/12 (EP,US);
A61F11/08 (EP,US);
A61F11/085 (EP,US);
B29C44/1271 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/15] | A61F11/06, A61F11/14, C08J9/22, C08L75/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | NICHT AUFROLLBARER OHRSTÖPSEL AUS SCHAUM | [2012/15] | English: | NON-ROLL FOAM EARTIP | [2012/15] | French: | EMBOUTS AURICULAIRES EN MOUSSE SANS ROULER | [2012/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2010 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 19.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 29.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1956864 (SPERIAN HEARING PROT LLC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 10] - [0013] - [0021]; figures 2,7 *; | [X]US2005056289 (JENKINS JOHN ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 9-15 * paragraph [0032]; figure 4 *; | [A]GB2100606 (LEIGHT HOWARD S) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 75 - line 86; figures 1,6 * | International search | [A]US2005056289 (JENKINS JOHN ALLEN [US], et al); | [A]US6006857 (LEIGHT HOWARD S [US], et al); | [A]US5799658 (FALCO ROBERT N [US]); | [A]WO03013390 (BACOU DALLOZ USA SAFETY INC [US]); | [A]US4053051 (BRINKHOFF CARL H); | [A]US6695093 (FALCO ROBERT [US]) | by applicant | EP1956864 | US2005056289 |