EP2464447 - DEVICE FOR ADDING GAS TO FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brensing, Karl August Rheinstraße 37 53179 Bonn / DE | For all designated states Dedenbach, Michael Rheinstraße 37 53179 Bonn / DE | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Fitzner, Ulrich Fitzner & Frese PartGmbH Rechtsanwalt - Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Fitzner, Ulrich Dres. Fitzner Rechts- und Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2012/25] | Fitzner, Ulrich Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10755116.0 | 16.08.2010 | [2016/37] | WO2010EP61908 | Priority number, date | DE20091026376 | 14.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009026376 | [2012/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011018529 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464447 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2464447 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, B01F5/04, B01F5/10, C02F9/00, C02F1/72, C02F1/76, C02F1/78 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
B01F23/232 (EP,US);
C02F9/20 (EP,US);
B01F25/32 (EP,US);
B01F25/53 (EP,US);
B01F2025/918 (EP,US);
C02F1/722 (EP,US);
C02F1/76 (EP,US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C02F2103/026 (EP,US);
C02F2209/02 (EP,US);
C02F2209/23 (EP,US);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINTRAG VON GAS IN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2012/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR ADDING GAS TO FLUIDS | [2012/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION DE GAZ DANS DES LIQUIDES | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 15.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2010 | AL | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | MT | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
AL | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
MT | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
AL | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MT | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.08.2010 | |
AL | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MT | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MT | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MT | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 14.09.2016 | |
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2606150 (THORP CLARK E) [A] 3,11 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 12 - line 55 *; | [XI]DE1517440 (AUGUST KLUEBER APPBAU WASSERAU) [X] 10,13,14 * figure 1 * * example 1 * [I] 1-9,11,12,15,16; | [I]DE2556328 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-16 * figure 1 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 26 *; | [XI]WO02102723 (VRM ENTPR PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,13,14 * figure 2 * * page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 33 * [I] 3,5-8,11,12,15,16; | [XI]KR20030016875 (CHOI YUNG KYU [KR]) [X] 1-9,11,12,15,16 * the whole document * [I] 10,13,14; | [A]US2006086669 (JACK PETER D [CA], et al) [A] 5-8* paragraph [0024] *; | [XI]WO2008130710 (APPLIED PROCESS TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,9,10,13,14 * paragraphs [0029] , [0071] , [0077]; figure 4C * [I] 2,3,5-8,11,12,15,16 | by applicant | CH365342 | US4252654 | EP0068522 | DE3228045 | DE3220451 | DE3225674 | DE3737424 | DE3830909 | EP0394629 | EP0577475 | DE4227732 | DE29806719U | DE10016365 | DE10061890 | EP1405829 | DE10246452 | EP1491495 | DE10340024 | US2006237557 | DE202008001211U | - GILBERT, P.; DAS, J.; FOLEY, I., BIOFILMES SUSCEPTIBILITY TO ANTI MICROBILES ADV DENT RES, (1997), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 160 - 167 | - COSTERTON, J.W.; STUART, P.S.; BöNBERG, E.P., "Bacterial biofilmes a common cause of persistent infections", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, pages 1318 - 1322 | - LASA, 1.; DEL POZO, J.L.; PENADES, J.R.; LEIVA, J., "bacterial biofilmes and infection", AN. SIST. SANIT. NAVAR., (2005), vol. 28, pages 163 - 175 | - REUTER, S.; SIGGE, A.; REUTER, U., "Endemische Übertragungswege von Pseudomonas aeroginosa", HYG MIKROBIOL, (2002), vol. 6, pages 6 - 12 | - BRENSING, HYG MED, (2009), vol. 34 |