EP2493872 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF LENALIDOMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited Head Office: 12th Floor Devika Tower 06 Nehru Place New Delhi Delhi 110019 / IN | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPOOR, Munish House No. 2026 B-Haveli Jamadar Chaurasti Attari Amritsar Punjab 143006 / IN | 02 /
KUMAR, Saridi, Madhava, Dileep S-122 First Floor Uppal's Southend Badshapur (Post), Sector - 49, Gurgaon Haryana 122101 / IN | 03 /
MURUGESAN, Balaguru D-28 Rajanarayan Gardens Periyanaiken Palayam SRKV (PO), Coimbatore Tamil Nadu 641020 / IN | 04 /
SATHYANARAYANA, Swargam H. No. 9-6-194 Ram Nagar Karim Nagar Andhra Pradesh 505002 / IN | 05 /
THAPER, Rajesh, Kumar Quarter Number 67-68 Roulki Bakshi Nagar Jammu Jammu and Kashmir 180001 / IN | 06 /
PRASAD, Mohan House No. P-3/3 Phase - II DLF Qutab Enclave Gurgaon Haryana 122001 / IN | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John Cronin Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 CH-1260 Nyon / CH | [2012/36] | Application number, filing date | 10755246.5 | 03.09.2010 | WO2010IB53981 | Priority number, date | INDE18232009 | 03.09.2009 Original published format: IN DE18232009 | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011027326 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2493872 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LENALIDOMID | [2012/36] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF LENALIDOMIDE | [2012/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE LÉNALIDOMIDE | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 29.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]IN47CHE2006 (DR REDDYS LABORATORIES LIMITED, INDIA) [X] 1-6 * page 9 - page 10 * * examples 5, 6 *; | [AD]WO9803502 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2009114601 (REDDYS LAB LTD DR [IN], et al) [XP] 1-6 * examples 1,2 ** page 6 - page 7 *; | [A] - MULLER G W ET AL, "Amino-substituted thalidomide analogs: potent inhibitors of TNF-alpha production", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00250-4, (19990607), vol. 9, no. 11, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1625 - 1630, XP004169632 [A] 1-6 * Scheme 2 page 1627 compound 7a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00250-4 | Examination | WO2010056384 | by applicant | US5635517 | WO9803502 |