EP2412741 - EPOXY RESIN COMPOSITION, PREPREG, CARBON FIBER REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL, AND HOUSING FOR ELECTRONIC OR ELECTRICAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Yuki c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-3193 / JP | 02 /
HONDA, Shiro c/o Nagoya Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 9-1 Oe-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMOTO, Shiori c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-3193 / JP | [2019/42] |
Former [2012/05] | 01 /
MAEDA, Yuki c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-3193 / JP | ||
02 /
HONDA, Shiro c/o Nagoya Plant Toray Industries Inc. 9-1 Oe-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWAMOTO, Shiori c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui Masaki-cho Iyo-gun Ehime 791-3193 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2012/05] | Webster, Jeremy Mark Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10755758.9 | 04.02.2010 | [2019/43] | WO2010JP51589 | Priority number, date | JP20090073360 | 25.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009073360 | [2012/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010109957 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2412741 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2412741 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/32, C08J5/24, C08K5/521, C08K5/5399, C08L63/00, C08L71/10 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
C08L63/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/3218 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/042 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/24 (KR);
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
C08K5/521 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/5399 (EP,KR,US);
C08L71/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2650/56 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2363/04 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L2666/22 (EP,US);
C08L71/00, C08L2666/22 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EPOXIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, PREPREG, KOHLENSTOFFFASERVERSTÄRKTES VERBUNDMATERIAL UND GEHÄUSE FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE UND ELEKTRISCHE KOMPONENTEN | [2012/05] | English: | EPOXY RESIN COMPOSITION, PREPREG, CARBON FIBER REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL, AND HOUSING FOR ELECTRONIC OR ELECTRICAL COMPONENT | [2012/05] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ÉPOXYDE, PRÉIMPRÉGNÉ, MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE RENFORCÉ DE FIBRE DE CARBONE, ET COFFRET POUR COMPOSANTS ÉLECTRONIQUES OU ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2011 | Translation filed | 12.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 24.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2010 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IE | 04.02.2020 | LU | 04.02.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.02.2010 | |
AT | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IE | 04.02.2020 | ||
LU | 04.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IE | 04.02.2020 | ||
LU | 04.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IE | 04.02.2020 | ||
LU | 04.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IE | 04.02.2020 | ||
LU | 04.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
LU | 04.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
LU | 04.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
LU | 04.02.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 23.10.2019 | |
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2006193618 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * page 2 - page 3; claims 1-16 *[A] 3-7; | [XA]EP1775321 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 16 - page 18; examples 3,5; table 2 * [A] 3-7 | International search | [A]WO2005082982 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [X]WO2006001445 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al); | [X]JP2006193618 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008088277 (TOHO TENAX CO LTD) |