EP2412347 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF ABSORBENT BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Kinseichoshimobun Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Makoto c/o UNI-CHARM CORPORATION Technical Center 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Peter, Julian Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Peter, Julian Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10755789.4 | 18.02.2010 | WO2010JP52434 | Priority number, date | JP20090072450 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009072450 | [2012/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010109988 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2412347 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F13/472, A61F13/49, D04H1/72 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
A61F13/15617 (EP,US);
A61F13/15577 (EP,US);
A61F13/15658 (EP,US);
D04H1/736 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SAUGFÄHIGEN KÖRPERS | [2012/05] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF ABSORBENT BODY | [2012/05] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CORPS ABSORBANT | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2011 | Translation filed | 23.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 06.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH04161153 (KAO CORP); | [A]JP2000178866 (KAO CORP); | [A]JP2002272782 (DAIO SEISHI KK, et al); | [A]JP2004222774 (DAIO SEISHI KK); | [A]JP2008231609 (KAO CORP) | by applicant | JP2008231609 |