EP2411896 - TOUCH PANEL ASSEMBLY WITH HAPTIC EFFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/05] | TOUCH PANEL ASSEMBLY WITH HAPTIC EFFECTS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | ||
[2018/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Methode Electronics, Inc. 111 West Buchanan Street Carthage, IL 62321 / US | [2018/44] |
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states Methode Electronics, Inc. 111 West Buchanan Street Carthage, IL 62321 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Robert 16734 N. Stanmoor Drive Livonia MI 48154 / US | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Winterstrasse 2 22765 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | Prinz & Partner mbB Winterstrasse 2 22765 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/05] | Sayer, Robert David, et al Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way Croydon, Surrey CR0 0XZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10756728.1 | 23.03.2010 | [2018/44] | WO2010US28344 | Priority number, date | US20090249873P | 08.10.2009 Original published format: US 249873 P | US20090408824 | 23.03.2009 Original published format: US 408824 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010111289 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2411896 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411896 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/01 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP);
G06F3/0412 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/05] | G06F3/041, G06F3/14, G06F3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMANORDNUNG MIT HAPTISCHEN EFFEKTEN | [2018/24] | English: | TOUCH PANEL ASSEMBLY WITH HAPTIC EFFECTS | [2018/24] | French: | ENSEMBLE ÉCRAN TACTILE AVEC EFFETS HAPTIQUES | [2018/24] |
Former [2012/05] | BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMANORDNUNG MIT HAPTISCHEN EFFEKTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2012/05] | TOUCH PANEL ASSEMBLY WITH HAPTIC EFFECTS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | ||
Former [2012/05] | ENSEMBLE ÉCRAN TACTILE AVEC EFFETS HAPTIQUES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 22.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15194301.6 / EP3021201 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2010 | AT | 31.10.2018 | CY | 31.10.2018 | CZ | 31.10.2018 | DK | 31.10.2018 | EE | 31.10.2018 | ES | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | HR | 31.10.2018 | LT | 31.10.2018 | LV | 31.10.2018 | MC | 31.10.2018 | MK | 31.10.2018 | NL | 31.10.2018 | PL | 31.10.2018 | RO | 31.10.2018 | SI | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | SM | 31.10.2018 | TR | 31.10.2018 | BG | 31.01.2019 | NO | 31.01.2019 | GR | 01.02.2019 | IS | 28.02.2019 | PT | 01.03.2019 | IE | 23.03.2019 | IT | 23.03.2019 | LU | 23.03.2019 | MT | 23.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.03.2010 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
IT | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
MT | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CY | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
IT | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
MT | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
IT | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
MT | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
IT | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
IT | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 23.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
LU | 23.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 31.10.2018 | |
NO | 31.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1450247 (GIAT IND SA [FR]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0047] * * figures 1,5 *[I] 2-6,8-15; | [XI]EP1560102 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0058] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2-6,8-15; | [XI]US2007057927 (PRADOS MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0066] * * figures 1,5,6 * [I] 2-6,8-15 | International search | [A]EP0419145 (PSION PLC [GB]); | [A]US6031524 (KUNERT STEVEN R [US]); | [A]KR200258353Y (IMMERSION CORPORATION); | [X]US2002033795 (SHAHOIAN ERIK J [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1450247 | EP1560102 | US2007057927 |