EP2411820 - SCRUB INDUCING COMPLIANT ELECTRICAL CONTACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xcerra Corporation 825 University Avenue Norwood, MA / US | [2015/40] |
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states Delaware Capital Formation, Inc. 501 Silverside Road, Suite 5 Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHABINEAU-LOVGREN, Scott 270 Garfield Ave. Pomona, CA 91767 / US | 02 /
SARGEANT, Steve, B. 531 South Calle De Casas Anaheim Hills, CA 92807 / US | 03 /
SWART, Mark, A. 18812 Ridgeview Circle Villa Park, CA 92861 / US | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/05] | 01 /
CHABINEAU-LOVGREN, Scott 270 Garfield Ave. Pomona CA 91767 / US | ||
02 /
SARGEANT, Steve, B. 531 South Calle De Casas Anaheim Hills CA 92807 / US | |||
03 /
SWART, Mark, A. 18812 Ridgeview Circle Villa Park CA 92861 / US | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2015/24] |
Former [2012/05] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 DE-80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10756871.9 | 25.03.2010 | WO2010US28727 | Priority number, date | US20090164065P | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 164065 P | US20090629790 | 02.12.2009 Original published format: US 629790 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010111532 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411820 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411820 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02, G01R1/067, G01R3/00, H01R12/71, H01R13/24 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
G01R1/06722 (EP,US);
G01R1/067 (KR);
H01R12/714 (EP,US);
G01R1/06733 (EP,US);
G01R3/00 (EP,US);
H01R13/2421 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/05] | G01R31/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHEUEREINLEITENDER KONFORMER ELEKTRISCHER KONTAKT | [2012/05] | English: | SCRUB INDUCING COMPLIANT ELECTRICAL CONTACT | [2012/05] | French: | CONTACT ÉLECTRIQUE CONFORME INDUISANT UN NETTOYAGE | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 26.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2010 | AT | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MK | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | SM | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.03.2010 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MK | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.03.2010 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MK | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009075529 (JOHNSTON CHARLES J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0059] *; | [X]JP2006292456 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XI]US4560223 (COONEY JAMES S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 43 * [I] 4-14 | International search | [X]US2001039128 (TATEISHI MASARU [JP], et al); | [Y]US6945827 (GRUBE GARY W [US], et al); | [Y]US3458851 (STELLA ANTHONY J) | by applicant | US2009075529 | JP2006292456 | US4560223 | US2001039128 | US6945827 | US3458851 |