EP2483475 - A SECURITY FEATURE FOR INCLUSION IN A SECURITY PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D.W. Spinks (Embossing) Limited Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London Greater London WC1V 6AY / GB | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPINKS, Gary Donald c/o D W Spinks (Embossing) Ltd Unit 3 Hale Wharf Ferry Lane, Tottenham London N17 9NF / GB | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Critten, Matthew Peter, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Critten, Matthew Peter, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10757437.8 | 28.09.2010 | WO2010EP64386 | Priority number, date | GB20090017166 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: GB 0917166 | EP20100154172 | 19.02.2010 Original published format: EP 10154172 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011039199 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2483475 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/42, B42D15/00 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
D21H21/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSMERKMAL ZUM EINSCHLUSS IN EIN SICHERHEITSPAPIER | [2012/32] | English: | A SECURITY FEATURE FOR INCLUSION IN A SECURITY PAPER | [2012/32] | French: | ELÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ DESTINÉ À ÊTRE INSÉRÉ DANS UN PAPIER DE SÉCURITÉ | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 11.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 15.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2300596 (PORTALS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,13-15 * figures 1,2; claims 1-17 *; | [A]US2002066543 (LILLY WILLIAM D [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2b; claims 1-20 *; | [AD]WO2004025028 (DW SPINKS EMBOSSING LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-15 * figures 1,2; claims 1-36 *; | [A]EP0303725 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006065154 (POTRAWA THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0246528 (SPECTRA SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0314350 (DE LA RUE THOMAS & CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004025028 | GB2300596 | WO0246528 |