EP2547917 - BLIND RIVET WITH A PLASTIC RIVET BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain US-CT 06053 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALTENBERGER, Reimar Tucker GmbH Max-Eyth-Straße 1 35394 Gießen / DE | 02 /
REINDL, Johann, A. Tucker GmbH Max-Eyth-Straße 1 35394 Gießen / DE | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Stephan Tucker GmbH Max-Eyth-Straße 1 35394 Gießen / DE | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/04] | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10757584.7 | 14.09.2010 | WO2010EP63498 | Priority number, date | DE20101002847 | 15.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010002847 | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011113498 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2547917 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2547917 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16B19/10, F16B5/04 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
F16B19/1045 (EP,US);
F16B19/1054 (US);
F16B5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLINDNIETE MIT NIETENKÖRPER AUS KUNSTSTOFF | [2013/04] | English: | BLIND RIVET WITH A PLASTIC RIVET BODY | [2013/04] | French: | RIVET AVEUGLE AYANT UN CORPS DE RIVET EN PLASTIQUE | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 19.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2010 | AL | 25.02.2015 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | IE | 14.09.2015 | LU | 14.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2200422 (AVDEL LTD) [A] 1* page 5, lines 11-25; figure - *; | [A]EP0398403 (GARONNE ETS AURIOL & CIE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0677666 (AVDEL SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1479924 (NEWFREY LLC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0016] , [0022]; figures 4,4a *; | [A]WO2005075841 (TELEZYGOLOGY INC [AU], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 16-19; figure - * | by applicant | DE2906250 | EP1728569 |