EP2416183 - OPTICAL MEMBER, PLASTIC LENS FOR EYEGLASSES, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/06] | LIGHT-EMITTING MEMBER, PLASTIC LENS FOR GLASSES, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | ||
[2014/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokai Optical Co., Ltd. 5-26, Shimoda, Eta-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-2192 / JP | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKAGAWA Tsuyoshi C/O Tokai Optical Co. Ltd. 5-26 Aza-shimoda Eta-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-2192 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI Hirotoshi C/O Tokai Optical Co. Ltd. 5-26 Aza-shimoda Eta-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-2192 / JP | 03 /
UMEMURA Kazuyoshi C/O Tokai Optical Co. Ltd. 5-26 Aza-shimoda Eta-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi 444-2192 / JP | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/06] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10758398.1 | 15.03.2010 | WO2010JP54297 | Priority number, date | JP20090089456 | 01.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009089456 | [2012/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010113622 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416183 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2416183 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/11, G02B1/10, G02C7/00, G02C7/02, C23C14/34 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
G02B1/115 (EP,US);
C23C14/0042 (EP,US);
C23C14/083 (EP,US);
G02B1/113 (EP,US);
G02B1/14 (US);
G02B1/16 (EP,US);
G02B27/0006 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | G02B1/11, G02B1/10, G02C7/00, G02C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDES ELEMENT, KUNSTSTOFFBRILLENGLAS UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/06] | English: | OPTICAL MEMBER, PLASTIC LENS FOR EYEGLASSES, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2014/11] | French: | ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT, VERRE EN PLASTIQUE POUR LUNETTES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION APPARENTÉ | [2012/06] |
Former [2012/06] | LIGHT-EMITTING MEMBER, PLASTIC LENS FOR GLASSES, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2010 | Translation filed | 30.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 19.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2010 | AT | 23.04.2014 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | ES | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | HR | 23.04.2014 | LT | 23.04.2014 | LV | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | MK | 23.04.2014 | MT | 23.04.2014 | NL | 23.04.2014 | PL | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | SM | 23.04.2014 | TR | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | NO | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | IS | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.03.2010 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9641215 (SOLA INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 9 - page 10, line 2 * * pages 15,16; table 1 *; | [X]WO2004029323 (INCOAT GMBH [CH], et al) [X] 5,6 * page 2, lines 25-28 * * page 4, lines 4-10 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 2; table 1 *; | [AD]US2007178315 (THOMAS MICHELE [FR], et al) [AD] 5,8 * paragraph [0098] *; | [A]EP1284302 (HERAEUS GMBH W C [DE]) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] * | International search | [Y]JP2005338366 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [Y]JP2005234188 (ITO OPTICAL IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0990102 (NIKON CORP) | Examination | US5827580 | by applicant | JP2007520738 |