EP2416184 - OPTICAL MEMBER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stella Chemifa Corporation 3-6-3, Awaji-machi Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0047 / JP | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIGUCHI, Shinji c/o Izumi Factory STELLA CHEMIFA CORPORATION 1-41 Rinkai-cho Izumiotsu-shi Osaka 595-0075 / JP | 02 /
HIRANO, Kazutaka c/o Izumi Factory STELLA CHEMIFA CORPORATION 1-41 Rinkai-cho Izumiotsu-shi Osaka 595-0075 / JP | 03 /
MORI, Akira c/o Izumi Factory STELLA CHEMIFA CORPORATION 1-41 Rinkai-cho Izumiotsu-shi Osaka 595-0075 / JP | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10758475.7 | 23.03.2010 | WO2010JP54979 | Priority number, date | JP20090086472 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009086472 | [2012/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010113701 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416184 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/11, G02B1/00, // C04B111/80, C04B41/00, C04B41/50, C04B41/85, G02B1/02 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
G02B1/02 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5011 (EP,US);
C04B41/85 (EP,US);
G02B1/11 (EP,US);
G02B1/113 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/01 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/10 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/44 (US,EP);
C04B41/5011, C04B41/4529, C04B41/4556 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/06] | G02B1/11, G02B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES ELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2012/06] | English: | OPTICAL MEMBER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2012/06] | French: | ELÉMENT OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2011 | Translation filed | 05.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 23.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003072891 (MURAKAMI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0125] , [0126] , [0129] , [0136] * * paragraph [0113] * [I] 5,10; | [X]WO2008148462 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 5, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 3 *; | [A]WO2008156176 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 5,10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] *; | US2010089096 [ ] (TAMITSUJI CHIKAYA [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068] * | International search | [A]JPS61255301 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008081377 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO); | [Y]WO2008156177 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) |