EP2416175 - GPS TERMINAL, POSITIONING METHOD, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/06] | GPS TERMINAL, POSITIONING METHOD, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
Former [N/P] | For all designated states Nec Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANZEN, Yoshihisa c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Makoto c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
TSUYUKI, Syun c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10758550.7 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010JP55320 | Priority number, date | JP20090082913 | 30.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009082913 | [2012/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010113778 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416175 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2416175 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/34, G01S5/00, G01S19/05 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
G01S19/05 (EP,US);
G01S19/34 (EP,US);
G01S5/0027 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | G01S19/25, G01S19/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GPS-ENDGERÄT, POSITIONIERUNGSVERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND PROGRAMM DAFÜR | [2014/45] | English: | GPS TERMINAL, POSITIONING METHOD, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | [2014/45] | French: | TERMINAL GPS, PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, ET PROGRAMME | [2014/45] |
Former [2012/06] | GPS-ENDGERÄT, POSITIONIERUNGSVERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND PROGRAMM DAFÜR | ||
Former [2012/06] | GPS TERMINAL, POSITIONING METHOD, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM | ||
Former [2012/06] | TERMINAL GPS, PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, ET PROGRAMME | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2011 | Translation filed | 19.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 21.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2010 | AT | 05.11.2014 | BE | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | ES | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | HR | 05.11.2014 | LT | 05.11.2014 | LV | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | MK | 05.11.2014 | MT | 05.11.2014 | NL | 05.11.2014 | PL | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | SM | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | NO | 05.02.2015 | GR | 06.02.2015 | IS | 05.03.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | IE | 26.03.2015 | LU | 26.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 26.03.2010 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 26.03.2010 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 05.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03005055 (NAVICOM CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,5 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]JP2003344522 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2003344522 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2002062159 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2008003688 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2007166520 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2003339070 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2003161772 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | JP2009082913 | JP2005083859 | JP2005147720 |