EP2413713 - MILK-LIKE BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARTHASARATHY, Mukund 16308 Sunset Pointe Court Wildwood MO 63040 / US | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/06] | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10759165.3 | 01.04.2010 | WO2010US01016 | Priority number, date | US20090211862P | 03.04.2009 Original published format: US 211862 P | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010114627 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2413713 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/05, A23K1/16, A23K1/18, A23L1/035, A23L1/30, A23L2/38, A23L2/52, A23L2/66, A23L1/052, A23L1/302 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
A23L2/66 (EP,US);
A23K20/147 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,US);
A23K20/163 (EP,US);
A23K20/174 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A23L2/38 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L29/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | A23L1/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | MILCHGETRÄNKE | [2012/06] | English: | MILK-LIKE BEVERAGES | [2012/06] | French: | BOISSONS DE TYPE LAIT | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 18.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 12.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]DE3512705 (MEYER DOROTHEE) [I] 1-10,12 * claim 1 * * page 6, paragraphs 3, 5 - page 7, paragraph 4 * * page 8, paragraphs 3-5 * * page 9, paragraphs 3, 4 * * page 10, paragraphs 4-6 * * examples 1-3 * [Y] 11; | [IY]EP0241097 (FRIESLAND CONDENSFAB [NL]) [I] 1-10,12 * page 1, lines 6-14 * * page 2, lines 13-33 * * examples 4, 5; claim 1 * [Y] 11; | [XYI]US5085874 (JUNGVID HANS [SE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10,12 * column 1, lines 6-10, 26-34 * * column 2, lines 7-12 * * example 3; claim 1 * [Y] 11 [I] 1-10,12; | [IY]US5882714 (LEPINE ALLAN J [US]) [I] 1-10,12 * column 1, lines 11-54 * * page 7; example 1 * * claims 1, 14, 15 * [Y] 11; | [IY]US6020017 (MINGIONE ARMAND [US]) [I] 1-10,12 * column 1, lines 4-15, 41-56 * * examples 1, 2 *[Y] 11; | [X]US2003104033 (LAI CHON-SI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 9] , [0 36] , [0037] , [0 40] , [0 61]; claims 1, 2, 4, 11, 13; tables 2, 13 * | International search | [A]US5807601 (CARPENTER ROBERT N [US], et al); | [Y]US6475539 (DEWILLE NORMANELLA T [US], et al); | [Y]US6777391 (KRATKY ZDENEK [CH], et al); | [X]US2006134297 (BELL CRAIG [BR]); | [Y]US2007172568 (SPELMAN KIERAN P [US]) |