EP2415146 - A GRID TIE SOLAR SYSTEM AND A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nextronex Inc. 4400 Moline Martin Road Millbury, OH 43447 / US | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERHARDINGER, Peter, F. 2979 Manley Road Maumee OH 43537 / US | 02 /
FELTNER, David, R. 7541 Grenlock Drive Sylvania OH 43560 / US | 03 /
ASHTON, Richard, L. 9861 Dowling Road Perrysburg OH 43551 / US | 04 /
SIMONS, Robert, J. 6061 Cemetery Road Whitehouse OH 43571 / US | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston GB-Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10759403.8 | 01.04.2010 | WO2010US29623 | Priority number, date | US20090211649P | 01.04.2009 Original published format: US 211649 P | US20090267192P | 07.12.2009 Original published format: US 267192 P | US20100304036P | 12.02.2010 Original published format: US 304036 P | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010114995 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2415146 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/44 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
G05F1/67 (EP,US);
H02J3/46 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/02021 (EP,US);
H02J3/32 (KR);
H02J3/381 (EP,KR,US);
H02M7/44 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | DURCH EIN GITTER VERBUNDENES SOLARSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/06] | English: | A GRID TIE SOLAR SYSTEM AND A METHOD | [2012/06] | French: | SYSTÈME SOLAIRE RACCORDÉ AU RÉSEAU ET PROCÉDÉ | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 10.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/18] | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3922639 (SHIMAHARA YOICHI, et al); | [Y]US5329172 (KOHDAKA TAKAYUKI [JP]); | [Y]US6111767 (HANDLEMAN CLAYTON KLING PHILIP [US]); | [Y]US6232742 (WACKNOV JOEL B [US], et al); | [Y]US7031176 (KOTSOPOULOS ANDREW [NL], et al); | [Y]US7112891 (JOHNSON LARRY L [US], et al); | [Y]US2007221267 (FORNAGE MARTIN [US]) |