EP2499302 - MACHINE FOR PROCESSING A TRACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Plasser Bahnbaumaschinen-Industriegesellschaft m.b.H. Johannesgasse 3 1010 Wien / AT | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELBER, Hannes Meierhofweg 7 A-5020 Salzburg / AT | [2012/40] |
Former [2012/38] | 01 /
FELBER, Hannes Grabenstrasse 24 A-5020 Salzburg / AT | Application number, filing date | 10759581.1 | 18.09.2010 | WO2010EP05738 | Priority number, date | AT20090001784 | 11.11.2009 Original published format: AT 17842009 | [2012/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057689 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2499302 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2499302 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E01B27/02 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
E01B27/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINES GLEISES | [2012/38] | English: | MACHINE FOR PROCESSING A TRACK | [2012/38] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE VOIE | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 14.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2010 | AL | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | HR | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | MK | 28.08.2013 | MT | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | SM | 28.08.2013 | IE | 18.09.2013 | LU | 18.09.2013 | NO | 28.11.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | [2019/29] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 18.09.2010 | |
AL | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
LU | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 18.09.2010 | |
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
LU | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 28.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP0633355 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ [AT]) [YD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3706145 (BUCKSCH HERBERT, et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0743399 (SPENO INTERNATIONAL [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | AT322606B | JPS565001U | EP0633355 |