EP2486114 - LUBRICANT COMPOSITIONS FOR VACUUM PUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers Italy S.p.A. Via Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGANTI, Fabio Via Bassone 8 I-21040 Carnago (VA) / IT | 02 /
CARSETTI, Valerio Via don Minzoni 2/7 I-20020 Arese (MI) / IT | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de la Fusée, 98 1130 Haren / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Benvenuti, Federica SOLVAY SA Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 10759933.4 | 01.10.2010 | WO2010EP64686 | Priority number, date | EP20090172280 | 06.10.2009 Original published format: EP 09172280 | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011042374 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2486114 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04, C10N40/00 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
C10M169/044 (EP,US);
C10M2213/00 (EP,US);
C10M2213/04 (EP,US);
C10M2213/043 (EP,US);
C10M2213/06 (EP,US);
C10M2213/0606 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2213/00, C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10M2213/00, C10M2221/04 (US,EP);
C10M2223/08, C10N2010/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | SCHMIERMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR VAKUUMPUMPEN | [2012/33] | English: | LUBRICANT COMPOSITIONS FOR VACUUM PUMPS | [2012/33] | French: | COMPOSITIONS LUBRIFIANTES POUR POMPES À VIDE | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 04.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 22.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1659164 (SOLVAY SOLEXIS SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0018] * * example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP1336614 (SOLVAY SOLEXIS SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0023] * * example -; claim - *; | [Y]JPH01265049 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 48, Database accession no. 1989-353232, XP002576837 & JPH01265049 A 19891023 (NIPPON MEKTRON KK) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0553768 | EP1454938 | US3715378 | US3665041 | US4523039 | EP0148482 | CA786877 | GB1226566 | US3242218 | US3214478 | WO8700538 | EP1336614 | WO2008000706 | EP0597369 | EP1479753 | EP1354932 | EP1712580 | EP1659164 |