EP2475423 - DYNAMIC NOISE REDUCTION IN AUDITORY PROSTHESIS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Bionics AG Laubisruetistrasse 28 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2015/16] |
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states Advanced Bionics, LLC Attn: Intellectual Property Dept. 28515 Westinghouse Place Valencia, California 91355 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LITVAK, Leonid, M. 842 Mansfield Los Angeles California 90038 / US | 02 /
SAOJI, Aniket 9810 Reseda Blvd. Apt 314 Northridge California 91324 / US | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/29] | Schwan - Schwan - Schorer Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10760174.2 | 09.09.2010 | [2016/50] | WO2010US48506 | Priority number, date | US20090241471P | 11.09.2009 Original published format: US 241471 P | [2012/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011032024 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2475423 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2475423 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, G10K11/175, H04R25/00, G10K11/178, G10L21/02 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
A61N1/36038 (EP,US);
G10L21/0208 (EP,US);
H04R25/45 (US);
H04R25/505 (EP,US);
H04R2225/41 (EP,US);
H04R2225/67 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG IN EINEM HÖRPROTHESENSYSTEM | [2016/30] | English: | DYNAMIC NOISE REDUCTION IN AUDITORY PROSTHESIS SYSTEMS | [2012/29] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE BRUIT DYNAMIQUE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE PROTHÈSE AUDITIVE | [2016/30] |
Former [2012/29] | DYNAMISCHE GERÄUSCHREDUKTION BEI HÖRPROTHESENSYSTEMEN | ||
Former [2012/29] | RÉDUCTION DYNAMIQUE DU BRUIT DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE PROTHÈSE AUDITIVE | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 05.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2010 | AL | 14.12.2016 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | IT | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | GB | 09.09.2017 | IE | 09.09.2017 | LU | 09.09.2017 | MT | 09.09.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.09.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
TR | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 09.09.2017 | ||
IE | 09.09.2017 | ||
LU | 09.09.2017 | ||
MT | 09.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.09.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 09.09.2017 | ||
IE | 09.09.2017 | ||
LU | 09.09.2017 | ||
MT | 09.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.09.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 09.09.2017 | ||
IE | 09.09.2017 | ||
LU | 09.09.2017 | ||
MT | 09.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.09.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 09.09.2017 | ||
IE | 09.09.2017 | ||
LU | 09.09.2017 | ||
MT | 09.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 09.09.2017 | ||
IE | 09.09.2017 | ||
LU | 09.09.2017 | ||
MT | 09.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 09.09.2017 | ||
IE | 09.09.2017 | ||
LU | 09.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 09.09.2017 | ||
IE | 09.09.2017 | ||
LU | 09.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.09.2017 | ||
LU | 09.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4630305 (BORTH DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 4, line 65 - column 10, line 46; figure 4 *; | [A]EP1326479 (DSP FACTORY LTD [CA]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0029] *; | US2004252852 [ ] (TAENZER JON C [US]) [ ] * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008116264 (COCHLEAR LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 3, line 5 - page 8, line 33; figures 6-8 *; | [A]EP2009955 (SIEMENS MEDICAL INSTR PTE LTD [SG]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2455824 (WOLFSON MICROELECTRONICS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-20 * page 4, line 9 - page 7, line 33; figures 1-4 *; | [AP]WO2009143588 (COCHLEAR LTD [AU], et al) [AP] 1-20* the whole document * |