EP2480369 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MODULE HAVING A HOLLOW SPACE BY HOT ISOSTATIC PRESSURE BONDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/31] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MODULE HAVING A HOLLOW AREA BY MEANS OF HOT ISOSTATIC PRESSING | ||
[2014/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COUTURIER, Raphaël 12 rue Jean Moulin F-38360 Sassenage / FR | 02 /
BERNARD, Charlotte 635 route de Bonneville F-74130 Contamine Sur Arve / FR | 03 /
REYTIER, Magali 15 allée des Peupliers F-38250 VILLARD DE LANS / FR | 04 /
RIGAL, Emmanuel 228 rue de la Balme F-38950 St Martin Le Vinoux / FR | [2012/42] |
Former [2012/31] | 01 /
COUTURIER, Raphaël 12 rue Jean Moulin F-38360 Sassenage / FR | ||
02 /
BERNARD, Charlotte 635 route de Bonneville F-74130 Contamine Sur Arve / FR | |||
03 /
REYTIER, Magali 8 rue Etienne Marcel F-38000 Grenoble / FR | |||
04 /
RIGAL, Emmanuel 228 rue de la Balme F-38950 St Martin Le Vinoux / FR | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2012/31] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10760985.1 | 23.09.2010 | WO2010EP64050 | Priority number, date | FR20090056655 | 25.09.2009 Original published format: FR 0956655 | [2012/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011036207 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2480369 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2480369 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/02, F28F3/12 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
B23K20/021 (EP,US);
B23K20/02 (KR);
F28F3/12 (EP,KR,US);
B23K2101/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MODULS MIT EINEM HOHLRAUM DURCH HEISSISOSTATISCHES PRESSEN | [2015/07] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MODULE HAVING A HOLLOW SPACE BY HOT ISOSTATIC PRESSURE BONDING | [2015/07] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MODULE A ZONE CREUSE PAR COMPRESSION ISOSTATIQUE A CHAUD | [2012/31] |
Former [2012/31] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MODULS MIT EINEM HOHLEN BEREICH MIT ISOSTATISCHER HEISSPRESSUNG | ||
Former [2012/31] | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MODULE HAVING A HOLLOW AREA BY MEANS OF HOT ISOSTATIC PRESSING | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 15.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2010 | AL | 10.06.2015 | AT | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MK | 10.06.2015 | MT | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | SM | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IE | 23.09.2015 | LU | 23.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.09.2010 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MK | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.09.2010 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 10.06.2015 | |
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 10.06.2015 | |
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2269556 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [AD]FR2879489 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [AD] 1-9* the whole document *; | [AD] - NORAJITRA P ET AL, "HIP experiments on the first wall and cooling plate specimens for the EU HCPB blanket", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MATERIALS, ELSEVIER BV, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0022-3115(02)01130-3, (20021201), vol. 307-311, ISSN 0022-3115, pages 1558 - 1562, XP004400621 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3115(02)01130-3 | by applicant | FR2879489 | JP2006263746 | - P. NORAJITRA ET AL., "HIP experiments on the first wall and cooling plate specimens for the EU HCPB blanket", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MATERIALS, (2002), pages 307 - 311 |