EP2473866 - ULTRASONIC ELASTOGRAPHIC STRAIN IMAGING WITH FADE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAE, Unmin P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510-8001 / US | 02 /
MAN, Junzheng P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road Briarcliff Manor, New York 10510-8001 / US | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10761066.9 | 18.08.2010 | WO2010IB53733 | Priority number, date | US20090239993P | 04.09.2009 Original published format: US 239993 P | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011027253 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2473866 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
G01S7/52071 (EP);
G01S7/52042 (EP);
G01S7/52074 (EP);
G01S7/52084 (EP);
G01S7/52073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL-ELASTROGRAFIEBILDGEBUNG MIT FADE-STEUERUNG | [2012/28] | English: | ULTRASONIC ELASTOGRAPHIC STRAIN IMAGING WITH FADE CONTROL | [2012/28] | French: | IMAGERIE ULTRASONORE ÉLASTOGRAPHIQUE DE DÉFORMATION AVEC CONTRÔLE DU FONDU | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 06.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/19] | 20.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2005054930 (RICKETS IAN W [GB], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0040] * [Y] 7,11 [I] 2,3,9; | [I]EP2030572 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0115] - [0148] *; | [IY]WO2009001077 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [I] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 2 * * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 19 * * page 8, line 19 - page 14, line 1 * [Y] 7,11; | [IY]EP1554982 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [I] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0046] * [Y] 7,11; | [YD]US6558324 (VON BEHREN PATRICK L [US], et al) [YD] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - column 9, line 45 *; | [Y]US2007230761 (GUNDEL LUTZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2007073145 (FAN LIEXIANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0028] *; | [A] - GAO L ET AL, "Imaging of the elastic properties of tissue-a review", ULTRASOUND IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960101), vol. 22, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1016/S0301-5629(96)00120-2, ISSN 0301-5629, pages 959 - 977, XP002559046 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0301-5629(96)00120-2 | by applicant | US6558324 | US5524636 | US6527717 | US5474070 | US6099471 | US5800356 |