EP2418802 - Path computation methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/07] | PATH COMPUTATION METHOD, PATH COMPUTATION ELEMENT, NODE DEVICE AND NETWORK SYSTEM | ||
[2012/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Jun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/07] | Barth, Stephan Manuel, et al Isarpatent Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10761194.9 | 02.04.2010 | WO2010CN71518 | Priority number, date | CN200910133506 | 08.04.2009 Original published format: CN200910133506 | [2012/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010115365 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2418802 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2418802 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/701, H04L12/717 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H04L45/42 (EP,BR,US);
H04L45/125 (BR,US);
H04J3/1611 (US);
H04J3/1652 (US);
H04L45/00 (EP,BR,US);
H04J2203/0098 (US)
|
Former IPC [2012/07] | H04L12/24, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pfadberechnungsverfahren | [2012/51] | English: | Path computation methods | [2012/51] | French: | Procédés de calcul de chemin | [2012/51] |
Former [2012/07] | PFADBERECHNUNGSVERFAHREN, PFADBERECHNUNGSELEMENT, KNOTENVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKSYSTEM | ||
Former [2012/07] | PATH COMPUTATION METHOD, PATH COMPUTATION ELEMENT, NODE DEVICE AND NETWORK SYSTEM | ||
Former [2012/07] | PROCÉDÉ DE CALCUL DE CHEMIN, ÉLÉMENT DE CALCUL DE CHEMIN, DISPOSITIF DE N UD ET SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2011 | Translation filed | 13.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 13.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2010 | AT | 26.06.2013 | BE | 26.06.2013 | CY | 26.06.2013 | CZ | 26.06.2013 | DK | 26.06.2013 | EE | 26.06.2013 | FI | 26.06.2013 | HR | 26.06.2013 | LT | 26.06.2013 | LV | 26.06.2013 | MC | 26.06.2013 | MK | 26.06.2013 | MT | 26.06.2013 | NL | 26.06.2013 | PL | 26.06.2013 | RO | 26.06.2013 | SE | 26.06.2013 | SI | 26.06.2013 | SK | 26.06.2013 | SM | 26.06.2013 | TR | 26.06.2013 | BG | 26.09.2013 | NO | 26.09.2013 | GR | 27.09.2013 | IS | 26.10.2013 | PT | 28.10.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.04.2010 | |
AT | 26.06.2013 | ||
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.04.2010 | |
AT | 26.06.2013 | ||
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 26.06.2013 | |
NO | 26.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - OKI UEC TOKYO TOMONORI TAKEDA NTT J-L LE ROUX FRANCE TELECOM A FARREL OLD DOG CONSULTING E, "Extensions to the Path Computation Element communication Protocol (PCEP) for Inter-Layer MPLS and GMPLS Traffic Engineering; draft-ietf-pce-inter-layer-ext-02.txt", EXTENSIONS TO THE PATH COMPUTATION ELEMENT COMMUNICATION PROTOCOL (PCEP) FOR INTER-LAYER MPLS AND GMPLS TRAFFIC ENGINEERING; DRAFT-IETF-PCE-INTER-LAYER-EXT-02.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, (20081201), vol. pce, no. 2, XP015061194 [X] 1,5,7-9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [03.2] * * paragraph [04.1] * * paragraph [04.2] * [Y] 2-4,6 | [Y] - MANNIE PERCEVAL D PAPADIMITRIOU ALCATEL E, "Generalized Multi-Protocol Label Switching (GMPLS) Extensions for Synchronous Optical Network (SONET) and Synchronous Digital Hierarchy (SDH) Control; rfc4606.txt", 20060801, (20060801), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015047371 [Y] 2,6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [02.1] * | [Y] - PAPADIMITRIOU D ET AL, "Generalized Multi-Protocol Label Switching (GMPLS) Signaling Extensions for G.709 Optical Transport Networks Control; rfc4328.txt", 20060101, (20060101), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015054943 [Y] 3,6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [03.1] * * paragraph [3.1.1] * * paragraph [3.1.2] * * paragraph [03.2] * | [Y] - DIMITRI PAPADIMITRIOU ALCATEL-LUCENT, "Ethernet Traffic Parameters; draft-ietf-ccamp-ethernet-traffic-parame ters-07.txt", ETHERNET TRAFFIC PARAMETERS; DRAFT-IETF-CCAMP-ETHERNET-TRAFFIC-PARAME TERS-07.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20090407), vol. ccamp, no. 7, XP015062045 [Y] 4,6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * | [A] - BERGER L ET AL, "Generalized Multi-Protocol Label Switching (GMPLS) Signaling Functional Description; rfc3471.txt", 20030101, (20030101), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015009254 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [3.1.1] * | International search | [A]US2006171320 (VASSEUR JEAN-PHILIPPE [US], et al); | [A]CN101296178 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |