EP2418887 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING POSITIONING REFERENCE SIGNAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Seunghee LG R&D Complex 533 Hogye 1-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Daewon LG R&D Complex 533 Hogye 1-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR | 03 /
KWON, Yeong Hyeon LG R&D Complex 533 Hogye 1-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-749 / KR | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/07] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10761897.7 | 09.04.2010 | WO2010KR02201 | Priority number, date | US20090168356P | 10.04.2009 Original published format: US 168356 P | US20090173607P | 29.04.2009 Original published format: US 173607 P | US20090176450P | 07.05.2009 Original published format: US 176450 P | KR20100032290 | 08.04.2010 Original published format: KR 20100032290 | [2012/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010117236 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2418887 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2418887 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, H04J11/00, H04L27/26, H04L5/00, H04W56/00 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP,US);
H04L27/2656 (EP,KR,US);
H04J11/0079 (EP,US);
H04L27/2602 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2607 (KR,US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L27/26134 (KR);
H04L27/26136 (KR);
H04L27/2675 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2678 (KR);
H04L5/0007 (US);
H04L5/0048 (KR);
H04L5/005 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR,US);
H04W64/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2012/07] | H04W16/24, H04L27/26, H04J11/00, H04W64/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON POSITIONIERUNGSREFERENZSIGNALEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2012/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING POSITIONING REFERENCE SIGNAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2012/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉMISSION D'UN SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE DE POSITIONNEMENT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2011 | Translation filed | 17.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 19.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13000905.3 / EP2597915 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.2015 | BE | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | HR | 05.08.2015 | IT | 05.08.2015 | LT | 05.08.2015 | LV | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | MK | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | SM | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | NO | 05.11.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | IS | 05.12.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | IE | 09.04.2016 | LU | 09.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MK | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MK | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 09.04.2016 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 05.08.2015 | |
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 05.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008132247 (ANDERSON ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0035] ** paragraph [0110] *; | [XI] - MOTOROLA, "Study on hearability of reference signals in LTE positioning support", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-091336, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090318), no. Seoul, Korea; 20090318, XP050338934 [X] 1,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 1-14 | [I] - NORTEL, "LTE neighbor cell hearability", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090765 (NORTEL-NEIGHBOR-HEARABILITY), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090206), no. Athens, Greece; 20090206, XP050318626 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "PHY layer specification impact of positioning improvements", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090852 - PHY LAYER SPECIFICATION IMPACT OF POSITIONING IMPROVEMENTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090203), no. Athens, Greece; 20090203, XP050318705 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Reference Signals for Low Interference Subframes in Downlink", no. R1-091314, (20090323), pages 1 - 8, R1-091314 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING 56BIS, SEOUL, SOUTH KOREA, 23RD-27TH MARCH 2009,, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/wg1_rl1/TSGR1_56b/Docs/, (20110509), XP002636007 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR100601939B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.); | [A]KR100602189B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.); | [A]KR20070023485 (LG ELECTRONICS INC.); | [A]WO2008156412 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) |