EP2417044 - STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Casepick Systems, LLC 200 Research Drive Wilmington, MA 01887-4442 / US | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LERT, John 134 Spruce Stree, 1 Watertown MA 02473 / US | 02 /
SULLIVAN, Robert 32 Fairmont Avenue Wilmington MA 01887 / US | 03 /
TOEBES, Stephen 89 Russell Street Sunderland, MA 01375 / US | [2012/11] |
Former [2012/07] | 01 /
LERT, John 134 Spruce Stree, 1 Watertown MA 02473 / US | ||
02 /
SULLIVAN, Robert 200 Research Drive Wilmington MA 01887-4442 / US | |||
03 /
TOEBES, Stephen 200 Research Drive Wilmington MA 01887-4442 / US | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2012/07] | Maupilier, Didier Schmit Chretien SNC 111 Cours du Médoc CS 400009 33070 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10762561.8 | 12.04.2010 | [2022/31] | WO2010US30669 | Priority number, date | US20100757337 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: US 757337 | US20100757381 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: US 757381 | US20100757220 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: US 757220 | US20090168349P | 10.04.2009 Original published format: US 168349 P | US20100757354 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: US 757354 | US20100757312 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: US 757312 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010118412 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417044 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417044 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65G57/00, B65G1/04, B65G1/137, B65G1/06 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
B65G1/0492 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65G1/04 (CN,KR);
B65G47/57 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65G1/045 (EP,KR,US);
B65G1/0485 (EP);
B65G1/065 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65G1/10 (KR,US);
B65G1/127 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65G1/1371 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65G1/1373 (KR,US);
B65G1/1378 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65G1/137 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/07] | B65G57/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERUNGS- UND ABRUFSYSTEM | [2012/07] | English: | STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM | [2012/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE ET DE RÉCUPÉRATION | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 11.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11190623.6 / EP2436618 | EP11190626.9 / EP2436619 | EP11190634.3 / EP2436620 | EP22166580.5 / EP4049952 | EP22178273.3 / EP4108611 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2013 | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2014 | 30.04.2019 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2019 | 30.04.2022 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | ES | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | NL | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | IE | 12.04.2023 | LU | 12.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/12] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01303211 (ITOKI KOSAKUSHO) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XI]JPH06316309 (ITOKI CREBIO CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [I] 4-15; | [X]JP2003012117 (ITOKI CREBIO CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2004065523 (LICHTI ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1* pages 1-8; figures 1-13 *; | [X]WO2008125294 (SSI SCHAEFER NOELL GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * pages 1-21; figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]US2006257236 (STINGEL FREDERICK J III [US], et al); | [Y]US2007177011 (LEWIN ANDREW C [GB], et al); | [A]US7329081 (BAKER JOHN RUSSELL [NZ], et al); | [X]US2009074545 (LERT JR JOHN G [US], et al) | by applicant | US20100757381 | US20100757337 | US20100757220 | US20100757354 | US20100757312 |