EP2526039 - REEL CHANGER HAVING A SECURING MEANS FOR A SAFETY AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHRIEDER, Erwin, Paul, Josef Rittershäuser Str. 3 97253 Gaukönigshofen / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Klaus, Karl Hans-Bolza-Str. 2 97855 Triefenstein-OT Trennfeld / DE | 03 /
OLBORT, Josef, Herbert Siebenbürgenstr. 9 97350 Mainbernheim / DE | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Koenig & Bauer AG - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10762650.9 | 01.10.2010 | WO2010EP64665 | Priority number, date | DE20101001014 | 19.01.2010 Original published format: DE102010001014 | [2012/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011088905 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2526039 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2526039 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12, B65H26/00 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
B65H19/126 (EP,US);
B65H26/00 (EP,US);
B65H2407/10 (EP,US);
B65H2551/15 (EP,US);
B65H2551/18 (EP,US);
B65H2553/412 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLENWECHSLER MIT EINER ABSICHERUNG EINES SICHERHEITSBEREICHES | [2012/48] | English: | REEL CHANGER HAVING A SECURING MEANS FOR A SAFETY AREA | [2012/48] | French: | CHANGEUR DE ROULEAUX AVEC UNE PROTECTION D'UNE ZONE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 30.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.04.2016
21.04.2016
ADMISSIBLE manroland web systems GmbH Alois-Senefelder-Allee 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [2016/21] | 03.06.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.10.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.01.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/30] | 31.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.03.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2010 | AL | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | IT | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | RS | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | AT | 01.10.2015 | IE | 01.10.2015 | LU | 01.10.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | BE | 31.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.10.2010 | |
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
AT | 01.10.2015 | ||
IE | 01.10.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 01.10.2010 | |
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
AT | 01.10.2015 | ||
IE | 01.10.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
AT | 01.10.2015 | ||
IE | 01.10.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 01.10.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009050332 (METSO PAPER INC [FI], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0037] *; | [A]US2007102556 (WYSOKOWSKI JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0035] *; | [AD]DE102007025800 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [AD] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]DE102006013955 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102007025800 | WO2005080241 | EP1986942 | EP1644191 | DE29500873U | DE102004038906 | DE102005030829 | Opposition | WO2009050332 | DE102007025800 | DE102006013955 | US2007102556 | DE102004021605 | WO2007096007 | DE102006062836 | DE4424537 | - Anonymous, ""Ultra Wide Web Offset" arrives", webline-Magazin der printcity, (20080000), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://www.printcity.de/tools/download.php?modul=library&path=/var/www/vhosts/printcity.de/httpdocs/add-files/library/&file=1352.pdf&filename=2008_12_09_Webline%2011%20GB.pdf&site_id=76, XP055289202 | - Anonym, "DLC 5000 & DLC 6000 Rollenwechsler mit fliegender Klebung", MEGTEC, (20080700), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.megtec.com/documents/DE_Dlc5000_6000.pdf, XP055289208 |