EP2464714 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FATTY ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific & Industrial Research Anusandhan Bhawan, 2 Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARBHA, Srinivas National Chemical Laboratory Dr. Homi Bhabha Road Pune 411 008 Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
SATYARTHI, Jitendra Kumar National Chemical Laboratory Dr. Homi Bhabha Road Pune 411 008 Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
THIRUMALAISWAMY, Raja National Chemical Laboratory Dr. Homi Bhabha Road Pune 411 008 Maharashtra / IN | 04 /
DESHPANDE, Shilpa Shirish National Chemical Laboratory Dr. Homi Bhabha Road Pune 411 008 Maharashtra / IN | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10763458.6 | 13.08.2010 | WO2010IN00538 | Priority number, date | IN2009DEL1690 | 13.08.2009 Original published format: IN DE16902009 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011018802 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464714 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2464714 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C11C1/06, C11B13/00 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
C11C1/06 (EP,US);
C11B13/00 (EP,US);
C11C1/04 (US);
Y02W30/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR FETTSÄUREN | [2012/25] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FATTY ACIDS | [2012/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDES GRAS | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 10.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2010 | AL | 26.06.2013 | AT | 26.06.2013 | BE | 26.06.2013 | CY | 26.06.2013 | CZ | 26.06.2013 | DK | 26.06.2013 | EE | 26.06.2013 | FI | 26.06.2013 | HR | 26.06.2013 | IT | 26.06.2013 | LT | 26.06.2013 | LV | 26.06.2013 | MC | 26.06.2013 | MK | 26.06.2013 | MT | 26.06.2013 | NL | 26.06.2013 | PL | 26.06.2013 | RO | 26.06.2013 | SE | 26.06.2013 | SI | 26.06.2013 | SK | 26.06.2013 | SM | 26.06.2013 | TR | 26.06.2013 | IE | 13.08.2013 | LU | 13.08.2013 | BG | 26.09.2013 | NO | 26.09.2013 | GR | 27.09.2013 | IS | 26.10.2013 | PT | 28.10.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
AT | 26.06.2013 | ||
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
LU | 13.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 13.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
DK | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 26.06.2013 | |
NO | 26.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]CN1168366 ; | [A]US2495071 (VICTOR MILLS) [A] 1-9; | [A]GB2146638 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1078910 (HALTERMANNASCOT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1733788 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0011] - [0023]; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US2007167642 (OKU TOMOHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0 58] , [0059]; examples 1-3; claims 1-18 *; | [I]WO2008063322 (CARGILL INC [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 67, Database accession no. 2001-590411, XP002608605 & CN1168366 A 19971224 (CAS DALIAN CHEM&PHYSICAL INST) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | US2458170 | US5383678 | US6258575 | WO03087027 | US6646146 | US6933139 | US2006047131 | EP1733788 | US2007004599 | US7482480 | US7754643 | - An Ullmann's Encyclopedia, Industrial Organic Chemicals: Starting Materials and Intermediates, WILEY-VCH, (1999), vol. 4, pages 2481 - 2532 | - H.L. BARNEBEY, THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (1948), pages 95 - 99 | - RUSSELL L. HOLLIDAY; JERRY W. KING; GARY R. LIST, IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (1997), vol. 36, pages 932 - 935 | - L. HARTMAN, THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS'SOCIETY, (1953), pages 349 - 350 | - WARNER M. LINFIELD; DENNIS J. O'BRIEN; SAMUEL SEROTA; ROBERT A. BARAUSKAS, JAOCS, (1984), vol. 61, pages 1067 - 1071 | - DADAN KUSDIANA; SHIRO SAKA, APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECH, (2004), vol. 113 - 11, page 781 | - IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2009), vol. 48, pages 4757 - 4767 |