EP2486736 - MULTICHANNEL AUDIO SYSTEM HAVING AUDIO CHANNEL COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 8500 Balboa Blvd. Northridge, CA 91329 / US | [2022/15] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 8500 Balboa Blvd. Northridge, CA 91329 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOULODRE, Gilbert, Arthur, Joseph 7 Manning Court Kanata ON K2K 3N3 / CA | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins Liebigstraße 39 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/15] | Rummler, Felix Maucher Jenkins Liebigstrasse 39 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10763570.8 | 04.10.2010 | [2022/15] | WO2010US51371 | Priority number, date | US20090248760P | 05.10.2009 Original published format: US 248760 P | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011044063 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2486736 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2486736 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04S1/00, H04S3/00, H04S7/00 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
H04S1/002 (EP,US);
H04S1/00 (KR);
H04R5/02 (US);
H04S3/00 (KR);
H04S3/002 (EP,US);
H04S7/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIKANAL-TONSYSTEM MIT TONKANALKOMPENSATION | [2012/33] | English: | MULTICHANNEL AUDIO SYSTEM HAVING AUDIO CHANNEL COMPENSATION | [2012/33] | French: | SYSTÈME AUDIO MULTIPLEX DOTÉ D'UNE COMPENSATION DE CANAL AUDIO | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 11.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2010 | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CY | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | IT | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | MK | 13.04.2022 | MT | 13.04.2022 | NL | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | TR | 13.04.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | IE | 04.10.2022 | LU | 04.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | FR | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 04.10.2010 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
TR | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
IE | 04.10.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 04.10.2010 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
IE | 04.10.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 04.10.2010 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
IE | 04.10.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.10.2010 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
IE | 04.10.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
IE | 04.10.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
IE | 04.10.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 13.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4218585 (CARVER ROBERT W [US]) [X] 1,2,10,12,13,18-21,25-27 * figures 4,5 * * column 9, line 60 - column 10, line 60 * * column 11, line 13 - line 43 * [I] 11,24; | [A]EP0329201 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,10-13,18-21,24-27 * figures 3,4,6 * * column 2, line 5 - line 55 ** column 8, line 27 - line 58 *; | [XI]US5136651 (COOPER DUANE H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13,20,21,27 * figure 1B * * column 6, line 33 - line 40 * * column 8, line 11 - column 43 * [I] 10,11,18,19,24-26 |