EP2473152 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING A HYDROPHOBIC DYE, A SPECIFIC MINERAL AND/OR ORGANIC ALKALINE AGENT, A SPECIFIC COMPOUND (I) AND A SPECIFIC ORGANIC COMPOUND (II), AND USE THEREOF IN DYEING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LALLEMAN, Boris 7 rue des Blancs Manteaux F-75004 Paris / FR | 02 /
LAGRANGE, Alain 5 rue de Montry F-77700 Coupvray / FR | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2020/12] |
Former [2012/28] | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10763794.4 | 01.09.2010 | [2020/12] | WO2010FR51821 | Priority number, date | FR20090055980 | 02.09.2009 Original published format: FR 0955980 | FR20090055982 | 02.09.2009 Original published format: FR 0955982 | FR20090055979 | 02.09.2009 Original published format: FR 0955979 | US20090242130P | 14.09.2009 Original published format: US 242130 P | US20090242437P | 15.09.2009 Original published format: US 242437 P | US20090242440P | 15.09.2009 Original published format: US 242440 P | FR20090059226 | 18.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0959226 | US20100297439P | 22.01.2010 Original published format: US 297439 P | [2012/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011027077 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2473152 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2473152 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/41, A61K8/49, A61K8/19, A61K8/35, A61Q5/06, A61Q5/10 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
A61Q5/065 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61K8/492 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/28] | A61K8/19, A61K8/35, A61Q5/06, A61Q5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM HYDROPHOBEN FARBSTOFF, EINEM SPEZIFISCHEN MINERAL UND/ODER ORGANISCHEN ALKALISCHEN STOFF, EINER SPEZIFISCHEN VERBINDUNG (I) UND EINER SPEZIFISCHEN ORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNG (II) SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR FÄRBUNG | [2012/28] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING A HYDROPHOBIC DYE, A SPECIFIC MINERAL AND/OR ORGANIC ALKALINE AGENT, A SPECIFIC COMPOUND (I) AND A SPECIFIC ORGANIC COMPOUND (II), AND USE THEREOF IN DYEING | [2012/28] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN COLORANT HYDROPHOBE, UN AGENT ALCALIN ORGANIQUE ET/OU MINÉRAL PARTICULIER, UN COMPOSÉ PARTICULIER (I) ET UN COMPOSÉ ORGANIQUE PARTICULIER (II), ET SON UTILISATION EN COLORATION | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 18.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 10.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2010 | AL | 18.03.2020 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | GB | 01.09.2020 | IE | 01.09.2020 | IT | 01.09.2020 | LU | 01.09.2020 | ES | 02.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | FR | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 01.09.2010 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
GB | 01.09.2020 | ||
IE | 01.09.2020 | ||
IT | 01.09.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 01.09.2010 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
GB | 01.09.2020 | ||
IE | 01.09.2020 | ||
IT | 01.09.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
GB | 01.09.2020 | ||
IE | 01.09.2020 | ||
IT | 01.09.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
GB | 01.09.2020 | ||
IE | 01.09.2020 | ||
IT | 01.09.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
GB | 01.09.2020 | ||
IE | 01.09.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 01.09.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 01.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0357548 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, line 61 - page 3, line 23 * * page 2, lines 20-26 * * page 2, lines 47-50; example -; claims 1-4,8 *; | [Y]DE4434494 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 38 * * page 3, line 60 - page 4, line 6; example -; claim - *; | [Y]FR2771286 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-15* page 6, lines 1-9; claims 1,17 *; | [Y]DE102004014764 (WELLA AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0012] - [0015] , [0017] , [0020] , [0026]; example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP1627626 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] - [0016] - [0021] , [0024]; example -; claim - *; | [Y]DE102004052480 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0012] , [0067] - [0074] - [0125] - [0128]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2008229520 (JAVET MANUELA [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0010] , [0013] , [0016] , [0023] - [0025]; example -; claim - *; | [Y]DE102007042286 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] - [0032] - [0037] - [0286]; example -; claim - * | by applicant | GB1026978 | GB1153196 | FR2140205 | FR2189006 | DE2359399 | FR2285851 | EP0173109 | JPS63169571 | DE3843892 | JPH0563124 | DE4133957 | WO9408969 | WO9408970 | WO9501772 | WO9515144 | WO9615765 | EP0714954 | FR2733749 | EP0770375 | DE19543988 | FR2771286 | FR2801308 | EP1378544 | EP1674073 | FR2886136 | - MEYLAN; HOWARD, "Atom / Fragment contribution method for estimating octanol-water partition coefficient", J. PHARM. SCI., (1995), vol. 84, pages 83 - 92 | - CHARLES M.HANSEN, Hansen solubility parameters A user's handbook, CRC PRESS, (2000), pages 167 - 185 | - Handbook of Solubility Parameters and other cohesion parameters, CRC, PRESS, pages 95 - 121,177- | - Handbook of Solubility Parameters and other cohesion parameters, CRC PRESS, pages 95 - 121,177- | - BAGDA, E; FARBE LACK, The relation between surface tension and solubility parameter in liquids, (1978), vol. 84, page 212 | - G. FONNUM; J. BAKKE; FK. HANSEN, COLLOID POLYM. SCI, (1993), vol. 271, page 380.389 |