EP2483403 - POLYPEPTIDES HAVING XYLANASE ACTIVITY AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes Inc. 1445 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Lan Wanliu Guangdahuayuan 5 2068 Beijing 100089 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Ye Huijingge 1815 Banbijie Nan Lu 8 Beijing 100089 / CN | 03 /
DUAN, Junxin No. 14 Xinxi Road Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
DING, Hanshu 2151 Caravaggio Drive Davis, California 95616 / US | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | NZ EPO Representatives Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Rasmussen, Preben Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [2012/32] | Rasmussen, Preben Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 10763939.5 | 29.09.2010 | [2017/46] | WO2010US50709 | Priority number, date | US20090246887P | 29.09.2009 Original published format: US 246887 P | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011041405 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2483403 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2483403 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/24, C07K14/385 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
C12N15/8246 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/2482 (EP,CN,US);
C12P13/00 (CN);
C12P5/00 (CN);
C12P7/02 (CN);
C12P7/26 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDE MIT XYLANASE-AKTIVITÄT UND DIESE KODIERENDE & xA; POLYNUKLEOTIDE | [2017/14] | English: | POLYPEPTIDES HAVING XYLANASE ACTIVITY AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING SAME | [2012/32] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES AYANT UNE ACTIVITE XYLANASE ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES LES CODANT | [2017/14] |
Former [2012/32] | POLYPEPTIDE MIT XYLANASEAKTIVITÄT UND FÜR DIESE KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE | ||
Former [2012/32] | POLYPEPTIDES PRÉSENTANT UNE ACTIVITÉ XYLANASE ET POLYNUCLÉOTIDES CODANT POUR CEUX-CI | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 19.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.09.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.2015 | Decision despatched | 19.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2010 | AL | 15.11.2017 | AT | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | ES | 15.11.2017 | HR | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | MK | 15.11.2017 | PL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | SE | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | SM | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | NO | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NO | 15.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO0224926 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1,4,6,8,9,14,20 * page 3 - page 12; claims 1-27; sequences 1-4 * * page 17 - page 18 * * page 23 - page 30 * * page 42 - page 45 * [Y] 1-25; | [Y]WO2009079210 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-25 * page 55 - page 62 * | [XY] - FURNISS CAROLINE S M ET AL, "The substrate specificity and susceptibility to wheat inhibitor proteins of Penicillium funiculosum xylanases from a commercial enzyme preparation", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (200503), vol. 85, no. 4, ISSN 0022-5142, pages 574 - 582, XP002610996 [X] 1,4,5,14,20 * page 574, paragraph introduction * * page 575, paragraph L * * page 577, column 1, paragraph 2; table 1 * [Y] 1-25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.1984 | [ ] - "Talaromyces emersonii endo xylanase (XEA) protein.", Geneseq, (20021007), Database accession no. AAU99346, URL: EBI, XP002611211 [ ] * compound . * | Examination | WO2011057140 | - "Penicillium pinophilum GH10 xylanase protein SEQ ID:52.", GENESEQ, (20110623), Database accession no. AZI04888, URL: EBI | by applicant | WO02095014 | WO9517413 | WO9522625 | US5223409 | WO9206204 | WO0056900 | WO9600787 | WO9533836 | WO0024883 | EP0238023 | WO9114772 | US7151204 | US6506559 | US6511824 | US6515109 | US6489127 | WO0218561 | US2002164730 | WO2006110891 | WO2006011899 | WO2006011900 | WO2006110901 | WO2006032282 | WO2005074647 | WO2005074656 | WO2007089290 | WO9117243 | WO9117244 | WO9105039 | WO9315186 | US5275944 | WO9602551 | US5536655 | WO0070031 | WO2005093050 | WO2005047499 | WO2007019442 | WO2008057637 | EP0495257 | EP0531315 | EP0531372 | WO8909259 | WO9407998 | WO9524471 | WO9611262 | WO9629397 | WO9634108 | WO9714804 | WO9808940 | WO9812307 | WO9813465 | WO9815619 | WO9815633 | WO9828411 | WO9906574 | WO9910481 | WO9925846 | WO9925847 | WO9931255 | WO0009707 | WO0250245 | WO0207679 | WO02101078 | WO03027306 | WO03052054 | WO03052055 | WO03052056 | WO03052057 | WO03052118 | WO2004016760 | WO2004043980 | WO2004048592 | WO2005001065 | WO2005028636 | WO2005093073 | WO2006074005 | WO2006117432 | WO2007071818 | WO2007071820 | WO2008008070 | WO2008008793 | US4435307 | US5457046 | US5648263 | US5686593 | US5691178 | US5763254 | US5776757 | WO9421785 | WO2006078256 | WO2009079210 | WO2005001036 | WO2009042846 | WO2009073709 | WO2009076122 | WO2009073383 | WO03062430 | US5658765 | US5693518 | US6245546 | WO9308275 | WO9102839 | WO9203608 | WO0224926 | EP0227159 | US6228630 | US6258590 | US5696068 | WO9535385 | WO2009037253 | WO0177315 | WO2008151079 | - ANAL. BIOCHEM, vol. 47, pages 273 - 279 | - BIELY; PUCHARD, "Recent progress in the assays of xylanolytic enzymes", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (2006), vol. 86, no. 11, pages 1636 - 1647 | - SPANIKOVA; BIELY, "Glucuronoyl esterase - Novel carbohydrate esterase produced by Schizophyllum commune", FEBS LETTERS, (2006), vol. 580, no. 19, pages 4597 - 4601 | - HERRMANN; VRSANSKA; JURICKOVA; HIRSCH; BIELY; KUBICEK, "The beta-D-xylosidase of Trichoderma reesei is a multifunctional beta-D-xylan xylohydrolase", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1997), vol. 321, pages 375 - 381 | - BAILEY; BIELY; POUTANEN, "Interlaboratory testing of methods for assay of xylanase activity", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 257 - 270 | - LEVER, "A new reaction for colorimetric determination of carbohydrates", ANAL. BIOCHEM, (1972), vol. 47, pages 273 - 279 | - DE VRIES, J. BACTERIOL., (1998), vol. 180, pages 243 - 249 | - ZHANG ET AL., "Outlook for cellulase improvement: Screening and selection strategies", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, (2006), vol. 24, pages 452 - 481 | - GHOSE, "Measurement of cellulase activities", PURE APPL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 59, pages 257 - 68 | - ZHANG ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, (2006), vol. 24, pages 452 - 481 | - GHOSE, PURE AND APPL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 59, pages 257 - 268 | - TEERI, "Crystalline cellulose degradation: New insight into the function of cellobiohydrolases", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 15, pages 160 - 167 | - TEERI ET AL., "Trichoderma reesei cellobiohydrolases: why so efficient on crystalline cellulose?", BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (1998), vol. 26, pages 173 - 178 | - VAN TILBEURGH ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1982), vol. 149, pages 152 - 156 | - VAN TILBEURGH; CLAEYSSENS, FEBS LETTERS, (1985), vol. 187, pages 283 - 288 | - VENTURI ET AL., "Extracellular beta-D-glucosidase from Chaetomium thermophilum var. coprophilum: production, purification and some biochemical properties", J. BASIC MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 42, pages 55 - 66 | - HENRISSAT B., "A classification of glycosyl hydrolases based on amino-acid sequence similarities", BIOCHEM. J., (1991), vol. 280, pages 309 - 316 | - HENRISSAT B.; BAIROCH A., "Updating the sequence-based classification of glycosyl hydrolases", BIOCHEM. J., (1996), vol. 316, pages 695 - 696 | - WISELOGEL ET AL., Handbook on Bioethanol, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (1995), pages 105 - 118 | - WYMAN, BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 50, pages 3 - 16 | - LYND, APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 24/25, pages 695 - 719 | - "Recent Progress in Bioconversion of Lignocellulosics", MOSIER ET AL., Advances in Biochemical Engineering/Biotechnology, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1999), vol. 65, pages 23 - 40 | - EBRINGEROVA ET AL., ADV. POLYM. SCI., (2005), vol. 186, pages 1 - 67 | - NIELSEN ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1997), vol. 10, pages 1 - 6 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - RICE ET AL., "EMBOSS: The European Molecular Biology Open Software Suite", TRENDS IN GENETICS, (2000), vol. 16, pages 276 - 277 | - PEARSON, W.R., Bioinformatics Methods and Protocols, (1999), pages 185 - 219 | - BOLTON; MCCARTHY, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1962), vol. 48, page 1390 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - HILTON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 4699 - 4708 | - DE VOS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, pages 306 - 312 | - SMITH ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 224, pages 899 - 904 | - WLODAVER ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1992), vol. 309, pages 59 - 64 | - REIDHAAR-OLSON; SAUER, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 53 - 57 | - BOWIE; SAUER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 2152 - 2156 | - LOWMAN ET AL., BIOCHEM, (1991), vol. 30, pages 10832 - 10837 | - DERBYSHIRE ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 46, page 145 | - NER ET AL., DNA, (1988), vol. 7, page 127 | - NESS ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 17, pages 893 - 896 | - MARTIN ET AL., J. IND. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2003), vol. 3, pages 568 - 576 | - SVETINA ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 76, pages 245 - 251 | - RASMUSSEN-WILSON ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1997), vol. 63, pages 3488 - 3493 | - WARD ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 498 - 503 | - CONTRERAS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 378 - 381 | - EATON ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1986), vol. 25, pages 505 - 512 | - COLLINS-RACIE ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 982 - 987 | - CARTER ET AL., PROTEINS: STRUCTURE, FUNCTION, AND GENETICS, (1989), vol. 6, pages 240 - 248 | - STEVENS, DRUG DISCOVERY WORLD, (2003), vol. 4, pages 35 - 48 | - FORD ET AL., PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (1991), vol. 2, pages 95 - 107 | - VILLA-KAMAROFF ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1978), vol. 75, pages 3727 - 3731 | - DEBOER ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25 | - "Useful proteins from recombinant bacteria", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (1980), vol. 242, pages 74 - 94 | - ROMANOS ET AL., YEAST, (1992), vol. 8, pages 423 - 488 | - GUO; SHERMAN, MOLECULAR CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 15, pages 5983 - 5990 | - SIMONEN; PALVA, MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (1993), vol. 57, pages 109 - 137 | - GEMS ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 98, pages 61 - 67 | - CULLEN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 15, pages 9163 - 9175 | - CHANG; COHEN, MOLECULAR GENERAL GENETICS, (1979), vol. 168, pages 111 - 115 | - YOUNG; SPIZIZEN, JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1961), vol. 81, pages 823 - 829 | - DUBNAU; DAVIDOFF-ABELSON, JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1971), vol. 56, pages 209 - 221 | - SHIGEKAWA; DOWER, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 742 - 751 | - KOEHLER; THORNE, JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1987), vol. 169, pages 5271 - 5278 | - HANAHAN, J. MOL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 166, pages 557 - 580 | - DOWER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, pages 6127 - 6145 | - GONG ET AL., FOLIA MICROBIOL., (2004), vol. 49, pages 399 - 405 | - MAZODIER ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1989), vol. 171, pages 3583 - 3585 | - BURKE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 6289 - 6294 | - CHOI ET AL., J. MICROBIOL. METHODS, (2006), vol. 64, pages 391 - 397 | - PINEDO; SMETS, APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2005), vol. 71, pages 51 - 57 | - PERRY; KURAMITSU, INFECT. IMMUN., (1981), vol. 32, pages 1295 - 1297 | - CATT; JOLLICK, MICROBIOS., (1991), vol. 68, pages 189 - 207 | - BUCKLEY ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1999), vol. 65, pages 3800 - 3804 | - CLEWELL, MICROBIOL. REV., (1981), vol. 45, pages 409 - 436 | - YELTON ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 1470 - 1474 | - MALARDIER ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 78, pages 147 - 156 | - BECKER; ABELSON, Guide to Yeast Genetics and Molecular Biology, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., vol. 194, pages 182 - 187 | - ITO ET AL., JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1983), vol. 153, page 163 | - HINNEN ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1978), vol. 75, page 1920 | - TAGUE ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1988), vol. 86, page 506 | - FRANCK ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 21, pages 285 - 294 | - CHRISTENSEN ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 18, pages 675 - 689 | - ZHANG ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1991), vol. 3, pages 1155 - 1165 | - EDWARDS; CORUZZI, ANN. REV. GENET, (1990), vol. 24, pages 275 - 303 | - ITO ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 863 - 878 | - WU ET AL., PLANT AND CELL PHYSIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 39, pages 885 - 889 | - CONRAD ET AL., JOURNAL OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 152, pages 708 - 711 | - CHEN ET AL., PLANT AND CELL PHYSIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 39, pages 935 - 941 | - KYOZUKA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 102, pages 991 - 1000 | - MITRA; HIGGINS, PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 26, pages 85 - 93 | - KAGAYA ET AL., MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS, (1995), vol. 248, pages 668 - 674 | - XU ET AL., PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 22, pages 573 - 588 | - GASSER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 244, page 1293 | - POTRYKUS, BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 535 | - SHIMAMOTO ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 338, page 274 | - HOOYKAS; SCHILPEROORT, PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 19, pages 15 - 38 | - CHRISTOU, PLANT JOURNAL, (1992), vol. 2, pages 275 - 281 | - SHIMAMOTO, CURRENT OPINION BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 158 - 162 | - VASIL ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 667 - 674 | - OMIRULLEH ET AL., PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 21, pages 415 - 428 | - "Cellulose bioconversion technology", PHILIPPIDIS, G. P., Handbook on Bioethanol: Production and Utilization, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (1996), pages 179 - 212 | - SHEEHAN, J.; HIMMEL, M., "Enzymes, energy and the environment: A strategic perspective on the U.S. Department of Energy's research and development activities for bioethanol", BIOTECHNOL PROG., (1999), vol. 15, pages 817 - 827 | - LYND, L. R.; WEIMER, P. J.; VAN ZYL, W. H.; PRETORIUS, I. S., "Microbial cellulose utilization: Fundamentals and biotechnology", MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 66, pages 506 - 577 | - FERNANDA DE CASTILHOS CORAZZA; FIAVIO FARIA DE MORAES; GISELLA MARIA ZANIN; IVO NEITZEL, "Optimal control in fed-batch reactor for the cellobiose hydrolysis, Acta Scientiarum", TECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 25, pages 33 - 38 | - GUSAKOV, A. V.; SINITSYN, A. P., "Kinetics of the enzymatic hydrolysis of cellulose: 1. A mathematical model for a batch reactor process", ENZ. MICROB. TECHNOL., (1985), vol. 7, pages 346 - 352 | - RYU, S. K.; LEE, J. M., "Bioconversion of waste cellulose by using an attrition bioreactor", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1983), vol. 25, pages 53 - 65 | - GUSAKOV, A. V.; SINITSYN, A. P.; DAVYDKIN, I. Y.; DAVYDKIN, V. Y.; PROTAS, O. V., "Enhancement of enzymatic cellulose hydrolysis using a novel type of bioreactor with intensive stirring induced by electromagnetic field", APPL BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 56, pages 141 - 153 | - CHANDRA ET AL., "Substrate pretreatment: The key to effective enzymatic hydrolysis of lignocellulosics?", ADV. BIOCHEM. ENGIN.LBIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 108, pages 67 - 93 | - GALBE; ZACCHI, "Pretreatment of lignocellulosic materials for efficient bioethanol production", ADV. BIOCHEM. ENGIN. / BIOFECHNOL., (2007), vol. 108, pages 41 - 65 | - HENDRIKS; ZEEMAN, "Pretreatments to enhance the digestibility of lignocellulosic biomass", BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (2009), vol. 100, pages 10 - 18 | - MOSIER ET AL., "Features of promising technologies for pretreatment of lignocellulosic biomass", BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (2005), vol. 96, pages 673 - 686 | - TAHERZADEH; KARIMI, "Pretreatment of lignocellulosic wastes to improve ethanol and biogas production: A review", INT. J. OF MOL. SCI., (2008), vol. 9, pages 1621 - 1651 | - YANG; WYMAN, "Pretreatment: the key to unlocking low-cost cellulosic ethanol", BIOFUELS BIOPRODUCTS AND BIOREFINING-BIOFPR., (2008), vol. 2, pages 26 - 40 | - DUFF; MURRAY, BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 855, pages 1 - 33 | - GALBE; ZACCHI, APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 59, pages 618 - 628 | - BALLESTEROS ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 129-132, pages 496 - 508 | - VARGA ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 113-116, pages 509 - 523 | - SASSNER ET AL., ENZYME MICROB. TECHNOL., (2006), vol. 39, pages 756 - 762 | - SCHELL ET AL., BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (2004), vol. 91, pages 179 - 188 | - LEE ET AL., ADV. BIOCHEM. ENG. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 65, pages 93 - 115 | - WYMAN ET AL., BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (2005), vol. 96, pages 1959 - 1966 | - MOSIER ET AL., BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (2005), vol. 96, pages 673 - 686 | - SCHMIDT; THOMSEN, BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (1998), vol. 64, pages 139 - 151 | - PALONEN ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 117, pages 1 - 17 | - VARGA ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2004), vol. 88, pages 567 - 574 | - MARTIN ET AL., J. CHEM. TECHNOL BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 81, pages 1669 - 1677 | - GOLLAPALLI ET AL., APPL BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 98, pages 23 - 35 | - CHUNDAWAT ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2007), vol. 96, pages 219 - 231 | - ALIZADEH ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 121, pages 1133 - 1141 | - TEYMOURI ET AL., BIORESOURCE TECHNOL., (2005), vol. 96, pages 2014 - 2018 | - PAN ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2005), vol. 90, pages 473 - 481 | - PAN ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2006), vol. 94, pages 851 - 861 | - KURABI ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 121, pages 219 - 230 | - SCHELL ET AL., APPL. BIOCHEM. AND BIOTECHNOL., (2003), vol. 105-108, pages 69 - 85 | - MOSIER ET AL., BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 96, pages 673 - 686 | - WYMAN, C. E.,, Handbook on Bioethanol: Production and Utilization, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, pages 179 - 212 | - GHOSH; SINGH, "Physicochemical and biological treatments for enzymatic/microbial conversion of cellulosic biomass", ADV. APPL. MICROBIOL., (1993), vol. 39, pages 295 - 333 | - "Ethanol production from renewable resources", GONG, C. S.; CAO, N. J.; DU, J.; TSAO, G. T., Advances in Biochemical Engineering/Biotechnology, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1999), vol. 65, pages 207 - 241 | - OLSSON; HAHN-HAGERDAL, "Fermentation of lignocellulosic hydrolysates for ethanol production", ENZ. MICROB. TECH., (1996), vol. 18, pages 312 - 331 | - VALLANDER; ERIKSSON, "Production of ethanol from lignocellulosic materials: State of the art", ADV. BIOCHEM. ENG.LBIOTECHNOL., (1990), vol. 42, pages 63 - 95 | - PENTTILA ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 45, pages 253 - 263 | - SALOHEIMO ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 63, pages 11 - 22 | - OKADA ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 64, pages 555 - 563 | - SALOHEIMO ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 249, pages 584 - 591 | - SALOHEIMO ET AL., MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 13, pages 219 - 228 | - OOI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 18, page 5884 | - SAKAMOTO ET AL., CURRENT GENETICS, (1995), vol. 27, pages 435 - 439 | - SAARILAHTI ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 90, pages 9 - 14 | - DAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 4973 - 4980 | - KAWAGUCHI ET AL., GENE, (1996), vol. 173, pages 287 - 288 | - LIN ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 69, pages 627 - 642 | - CHEN; HO, "Cloning and improving the expression of Pichia stipitis xylose reductase gene in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 39-40, pages 135 - 147 | - HO ET AL., "Genetically engineered Saccharomyces yeast capable of effectively cofermenting glucose and xylose", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIO/., (1998), vol. 64, pages 1852 - 1859 | - KOTTER; CIRIACY, "Xylose fermentation by Saccharomyces cerevisiae", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 38, pages 776 - 783 | - WALFRIDSSON ET AL., "Xylose-metabolizing Saccharomyces cerevisiae strains overexpressing the TKL1 and TAL1 genes encoding the pentose phosphate pathway enzymes transketolase and transaldolase", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 61, pages 4184 - 4190 | - KUYPER ET AL., "Minimal metabolic engineering of Saccharomyces cerevisiae for efficient anaerobic xylose fermentation: a proof of principle", FEMS YEAST RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 4, pages 655 - 664 | - BEALL ET AL., "Parametric studies of ethanol production from xylose and other sugars by recombinant Escherichia coli", BIOTECH. BIOENG., (1991), vol. 38, pages 296 - 303 | - INGRAM ET AL., "Metabolic engineering of bacteria for ethanol production", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1998), vol. 58, pages 204 - 214 | - ZHANG ET AL., "Metabolic engineering of a pentose metabolism pathway in ethanologenic Zymomonas mobilis", SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, pages 240 - 243 | - DEANDA ET AL., "Development of an arabinose-fermenting Zymomonas mobilis strain by metabolic pathway engineering", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 62, pages 4465 - 4470 | - SILVEIRA, M. M.; JONAS, R., "The biotechnological production of sorbitol", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 59, pages 400 - 408 | - NIGAM, P.; SINGH, D., "Processes for fermentative production of xylitol - a sugar substitute", PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 117 - 124 | - EZEJI, T. C.; QURESHI, N.; BLASCHEK, H. P., "Production of acetone, butanol and ethanol by Clostridium beijerinckii BA101 and in situ recovery by gas stripping", WORLD JOUMAL OF MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 595 - 603 | - CHEN, R.; LEE, Y. Y., "Membrane-mediated extractive fermentation for lactic acid production from cellulosic biomass", APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 63-65, pages 435 - 448 | - RICHARD, A.; MARGARITIS, A., "Empirical modeling of batch fermentation kinetics for poly(glutamic acid) production and other microbial biopolymers", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2004), vol. 87, no. 4, pages 501 - 515 | - KATAOKA, N.; A. MIYA; K. KIRIYAMA, "Studies on hydrogen production by continuous culture system of hydrogen-producing anaerobic bacteria", WATER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 36, no. 6-7, pages 41 - 47 | - GUNASEELAN V.N., BIOMASS AND BIOENERGY, (1997), vol. 13, no. 1-2, pages 83 - 114 | - BEDFORD ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1ST SYMPOSIUM ON ENZYMES IN ANIMAL NUTRITION, (1993), pages 73 - 77 | - ERIKSSON, WOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 24, pages 79 - 101 | - PAICE ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. AND BIOENG, (1988), vol. 32, pages 235 - 239 | - POMMIER ET AL., TAPPI JOURNAL, (1989), pages 187 - 191 | - VIëTOR ET AL., J. INST. BREW., (1993), vol. 99, pages 243 - 248 | - EWING ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 8, pages 175 - 185 | - EWING; GREEN, GENOME RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 8, pages 186 - 194 | - GISH ET AL., NAT. GENET, (1993), vol. 3, pages 266 - 72 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - CHRISTENSEN ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 1419 - 1422 |