EP2420133 - INTEGRATED VERTICAL GREENING MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanjing Lu Se Zu He Environmental Protection Ltd. NO.3-1 Hongmiaoxiang Gulou District Nanjing Jiangsu 210003 / CN | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Feiyun No. 3-1, Hongmiaoxiang Gulou District Nanjing Jiangsu 210003 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Lin 57A Drewry Ave. North York, ON M2M 1C9 / CA | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Akers, Noel James N.J. Akers & Co 63 Lemon Street Truro, TR1 2PN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Akers, Noel James N.J. Akers & Co. 7 Ferris Town Truro Cornwall, TR1 3JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 10764040.1 | 26.03.2010 | WO2010CN00331 | Priority number, date | CN2009129409 | 13.04.2009 Original published format: CN200910029409 | [2012/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010118627 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420133 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
A01G9/025 (EP,US);
Y02P60/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES VERTIKALES BEGRÜNUNGSMODUL | [2012/08] | English: | INTEGRATED VERTICAL GREENING MODULE | [2012/08] | French: | MODULE DE VERDURE VERTICAL INTÉGRÉ | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2011 | Translation filed | 19.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]CN101524038 (FEIYUN ZHAO); | [XP]CN201378969Y (FEIYUN ZHAO); | [Y]WO2006070164 (JULIA ARNOLD [FR]); | [Y]CN201162181Y (XIXIAN SUN [CN]); | [Y]FR2902966 (CLAYE JENNY [FR]); | [A]JP2007104986 (NIPPON CHIKO CO LTD); | [A]CN201150205Y (YINGJIE CHEN [HK]); | [A]US4779378 (MASON JR STANLEY I [US]) | by applicant | CN20091026012 |