EP2421097 - ANTENNA DEVICE AND MULTI-ANTENNA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANABE, Kosuke c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10764330.6 | 16.03.2010 | WO2010JP54401 | Priority number, date | JP20090099867 | 16.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009099867 | [2012/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010119744 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421097 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q21/28, H04B7/04, H01Q21/20, H01Q21/06, H01Q25/00 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q21/205 (EP,US);
H01Q25/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/08] | H01Q21/28, H04B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG UND MULTIANTENNENSYSTEM | [2012/08] | English: | ANTENNA DEVICE AND MULTI-ANTENNA SYSTEM | [2012/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE ET SYSTÈME MULTI-ANTENNE | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2011 | Translation filed | 13.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 28.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5969689 (MARTEK GARY ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * col.3, lines 18-29; abstract, lines 2-3; column 8, line 53 - line 54; figures 1a,2,6 * [I] 5,6,8; | [X]US4101901 (KOMMRUSCH RICHARD S) [X] 1 * column 2, line 11 - line 12; figure 7 *; | [X]US2003184490 (RAIMAN CLIFFORD E [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0004]; paragraph [0002] * | International search | [X]JPS6014512U (JAPAN RADIO CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPS51107147U (DAINICHI-NIPPON CABLES,LTD.); | [Y]JP2001189617 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) | by applicant | JP2001339237 | JP2009099867 |