EP2491703 - MOBILE DEVICE SHUTTER DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Yawei 5523 Mill Creek Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
YAMADA, Ichiro 979 Orange Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 03 /
ZUO, Hong 1246 Coronado Drive 19 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10765872.6 | 22.09.2010 | WO2010US49754 | Priority number, date | US20090603768 | 22.10.2009 Original published format: US 603768 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011049701 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2491703 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H05K5/00 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
H04M1/0237 (EP,US);
H04M1/0274 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSTÜR FÜR EINE MOBILE VORRICHTUNG | [2012/35] | English: | MOBILE DEVICE SHUTTER DOOR | [2012/35] | French: | PORTE DE FERMETURE DE DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2012/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 05.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 22.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009137294 (CHEN CHIEN-CHIH [TW]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022] ** figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2009146537 (WANG JIN-XIN [CN]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2106100 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 3,4 * |