EP2488549 - MYCOBACTERIAL VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isis Innovation Ltd Ewert House Ewert Place Summertown Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 7SG / GB | For all designated states Imaxio SA 181-203 avenue Jean Jaures 69007 Lyon / FR | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPENCER, Alexandra, Jane Jenner Institute Old Road Campus Research Building Roosevelt Drive Headington Oxford Oxfordshire OX3 7DQ / GB | 02 /
COTTINGHAM, Matthew, Guy Jenner Institute Old Road Campus Research Building Roosevelt Drive Headington Oxford Oxfordshire OX3 7DQ / GB | 03 /
HILL, Adrian, Vivian, Sinton Jenner Institute Old Road Campus Research Building Roosevelt Drive Headington Oxford Oxfordshire OX3 7DQ / GB | 04 /
HILL, Fergal Imaxio Sa 181-203 avenue Jean Jaures F-69007 Lyon / FR | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 87 rue de Sèze 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2012/34] | Tetaz, Franck Claude Edouard, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10766107.6 | 15.10.2010 | WO2010GB51741 | Priority number, date | GB20090018154 | 16.10.2009 Original published format: GB 0918154 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011045612 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2488549 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2488549 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/435, C12N15/62 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
A61K39/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/35 (EP,US);
C07K14/435 (US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K16/1289 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (KR);
C12N15/62 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6031 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MYKOBAKTERIELLE IMPFSTOFFE | [2012/34] | English: | MYCOBACTERIAL VACCINES | [2012/34] | French: | VACCINS MYCOBACTÉRIENS | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 05.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2010 | AL | 29.07.2015 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BE | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | IT | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | RS | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | IE | 15.10.2015 | LU | 15.10.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9111461 (BIOGEN INC [US]) [YD] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2008122817 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [YD] 1-35 * whole document and in particular p.2, l.8 and p.12, l.7. *; | [YD]WO2005014654 (AVIDIS SA [FR], et al) [YD] 1-35 * whole document and in particular p.19, l.3. *; | [Y]EP1795540 (IMAXIO [FR]) [Y] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [Y] - OGUN SOLABOMI A ET AL, "The oligomerization domain of C4-binding protein (C4bp) acts as an adjuvant, and the fusion protein comprised of the 19-kilodalton merozoite surface protein 1 fused with the murine C4bp domain protects mice against malaria", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (200808), vol. 76, no. 8, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 3817 - 3823, XP002612266 [Y] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.01369-07 | [YD] - MCSHANE H ET AL, "Recombinant modified vaccinia virus Ankara expressing antigen 85A boosts BCG-primed and naturally acquired antimycobacterial immunity in humans", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20041024), vol. 10, no. 11, doi:DOI:10.1038/NM1128, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1240 - 1244, XP002375252 [YD] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1128 | by applicant | WO9111461 | EP1795540 | WO2008122817 | WO2005014654 | - MCSHANE ET AL., NAT MED, (2004), vol. 10, page 1240 | - REYES-SANDOVAL ET AL., INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (201001), vol. 78, no. 1, pages 145 - 153 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - PUIGBO ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2007), vol. 35, no. 2, pages W126 - W131 | - TARACHA ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2003), vol. 71, page 6904 | - GEISER ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2001), vol. 31, page 88 | - J VIROL., (2008), vol. 82, pages 3822 - 3833 | - LEMCKERT ET AL., J VIROL., (2005), vol. 79, pages 9694 - 9701 | - ABBINK ET AL., J VIROL., (2007), vol. 81, pages 4654 - 4663 | - FARINA ET AL., J VIROL., (2001), vol. 75, pages 11603 - 11613 | - ROY ET AL., HUM GENE THER., (2004), vol. 15, pages 519 - 530 |