EP2421654 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ISOLATING A TARGET BIOENTITY FROM A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clinical Genomics Pty Ltd Riverside Life Sciences Building,11 Julius Avenue North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDLER, Howard Milne 3104/368 St. Kilda Road Melbourne Victoria 3004 / AU | 02 /
CHANDLER, Michael Bruce 107 White Horse Gully Road Chewton Victoria 3451 / AU | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Gardner, Rebecca Katherine Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Gardner, Rebecca Katherine Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10766508.5 | 22.04.2010 | WO2010AU00459 | Priority number, date | US20090171532P | 22.04.2009 Original published format: US 171532 P | US20090182661P | 29.05.2009 Original published format: US 182661 P | US20090285286P | 10.12.2009 Original published format: US 285286 P | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010121315 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421654 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B03C1/01, B03C1/06, G01N33/536 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
B03C1/288 (EP,US);
B03C1/01 (EP,US);
G01N33/54326 (EP,US);
B03C2201/18 (EP,US);
B03C2201/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ISOLIERUNG EINER BIOLOGISCHEN ZIELENTITÄT AUS EINER BIOLOGISCHE PROBE | [2012/09] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ISOLATING A TARGET BIOENTITY FROM A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE | [2012/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ISOLER UNE ENTITÉ BIOLOGIQUE CIBLE À PARTIR D'UN ÉCHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 30.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5795470 (WANG YUZHOU [US], et al); | [A]WO2006119569 (GENETIC TECHNOLOGIES LIMTIED [AU], et al); | [A]WO2007092713 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | [X]WO2009026566 (CYNVENIO BIOSYSTEMS LLC [US], et al); | [XP]WO2009117611 (CYNVENIO BIOSYSTEMS LLC [US], et al); | [XP]WO2009129415 (CYNVENIO BIOSYSTEMS LLC [US], et al); | [Y] - WONG, L. S. ET AL., "Detection of circulating tumour cells with the magnetic activated cell sorter", BRITISH JOURNAL OF SURGERY, (1995), vol. 82, pages 1333 - 1337, XP000999736 |